Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Burnett Foundation Aotearoa
CC22230
9429042674771
Registered

Registration details

27/03/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
New Zealand Aids Foundation 28/03/2008
Burnett Foundation Aotearoa 3/06/2022

Address for service

PO Box 6663
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142
31-35 Hargreaves Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1011

Charity's other details

09 303 3124
www.facebook.com/Burnett Foundation Aotearoa
www.twitter.com/Burnett Foundation Aotearoa


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Burnett Foundation Aotearoa has a vision of an Aotearoa with zero HIV transmissions where people living with or affected by HIV flourish. We aim to achieve this through our mission of preventing transmission, reducing stigma and maximising the well-being of those most affected by HIV. We are New Zealand’s national HIV prevention and services & outreach organisation. Our work includes social marketing for HIV and STI prevention, testing and provision of services and outreach, science, policy and advocacy. Burnett Foundation is a registered charity that grew out of gay community initiatives in the 1980s and today it brings history, passion, commitment, expertise and diversity to meet the emerging trends of the HIV epidemic and the changing needs of the communities it serves.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Prevent the transmission of HIV and STIs, reduce stigma and maximise the wellbeing of those most affected by HIV.

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 16/12/2024 $7,883,767 $7,512,942 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/11/2023 $6,796,834 $6,107,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 4/10/2022 $6,031,421 $5,788,281 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 23/09/2021 $5,905,067 $5,157,892 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 6/10/2020 $5,143,916 $4,916,307 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 30/09/2019 $5,050,979 $4,794,147 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 7/11/2018 $4,831,248 $4,526,364 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 26/10/2017 $4,757,258 $4,825,072 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 6/10/2016 $4,605,356 $4,755,571 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 26/10/2015 $4,608,197 $4,780,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alex Anderson Interim General Manager 4/11/2024
Rachel Devine Trustee 5/04/2024
James Boult Trustee 6/04/2023
Jordon Robertson Trustee 6/04/2023
James Stuart-Black MNZM Trustee 22/02/2023
Patricia Ann Mitchell Trustee 17/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joe Rich Chief Executive Officer 18/12/2024
Edward Coughlan Trustee 23/11/2024
Ian Kaihe-Wetting Trustee 23/11/2024
Sam Humphrey Trustee 26/02/2024
Jordon Harris Trustee 3/10/2023
Benjamin Mander Board Member 6/04/2023
Anthony Fallon Trustee 11/02/2023
Carol Lucas Trustee 11/02/2023
Guy Alexander Trustee 15/08/2020
Daniel Keys Trustee 9/02/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/12/2024 NOC059
4/12/2024 NOC057
25/11/2024 NOC056
4/11/2024 NOC055
7/05/2024 NOC054
5/04/2024 NOC053
9/03/2024 NOC052
20/11/2023 NOC050
13/10/2023 NOC049
29/06/2023 NOC048
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.