Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Aratu Trust
Te Aratu Trust
CC22301
9429042834953
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1919
Rotorua
3040
34 Ferguson Place
Fairy Springs
Rotorua
3015

Charity's other details

(07)349 4244
(07)348 2174


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mission Statement Te Aratu Trust exists to provide services for people with an experience of a disability to realize their potential and live life as valued members in their community. Service objectives ▪ To support people with disabilities to identify for themselves what a good life looks like for them and what they can do to achieve their goals and aspirations. ▪ Actively participate in and take on valued roles that contribute to the community. ▪ Experience increased independence and self-determination, ▪ Be fully integrated valued members in their community able to live as normal a life as possible and be able to live a good life as they define that to be. Service provision ▪ Te Aratu Trust operated from our premises at 34 Ferguson place, Fairy Springs, Rotorua. Our operational hours were Monday to Friday 8 a to 4 pm with some services also delivered outside these hours. ▪ We offer support and a variety of programs onsite and in the community to promote personal growth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Employment

People with disabilities

General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 29/11/2024 $453,526 $513,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/10/2023 $467,101 $412,294 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 31/10/2022 $389,516 $383,411 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/11/2021 $370,155 $363,309 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 6/10/2020 $387,348 $385,417 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/10/2019 $334,925 $337,364 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 30/10/2018 $315,104 $307,785 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/09/2017 $300,671 $284,978 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/09/2016 $299,963 $298,995 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 16/09/2015 $282,843 $272,158 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tracey Dunbar Trustee 15/11/2024
Christiani Russell Deputy Chairperson 13/10/2023
Reece James Mines Chairman/Treasurer 17/08/2022
Debbie Scothern Secretary 20/03/2013
Andrew Te Amo Trustee 25/09/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ian Edward Jesson Trustee 15/11/2024
Nigel Steven Walker Chairman/treasurer 31/07/2024
Craig Kirkland Trustee 7/08/2023
Rob Vigor-Brown Trustee 11/05/2022
Frederick Attwood Chairperson 26/11/2021
Dana Marie Bolton Trustee 16/09/2014
Pam Weedon Deputy Chairperson 16/12/2013
David Gordon O'connor Trustee 17/09/2013
Ngaire Fraser Trustee 20/06/2013
Mark Reindees Trustee 19/03/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/08/2024 NOC029
13/10/2023 NOC027
21/08/2023 NOC026
20/12/2021 NOC024
21/04/2017 NOC018
9/08/2016 NOC016
17/09/2014 NOC015
17/12/2013 NOC014
19/09/2013 NOC010
20/03/2013 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.