Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Churches Education Commission Trust Board
Launchpad
CC22320
9429042616351
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

CEC NATIONAL OFFICE PO Box 17178
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
Level 1
55 Hugo Johnston Drove
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

095260052


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Empowering children to make positive life choices ,through values based Christian education. This is achieved through excellence in the classroom, strengthening relationships, engaging with a new generation of volunteers and delivering new and innovative training resources.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Social services, Religious activities

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 14/05/2024 $714,914 $768,108 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 20/06/2023 $900,221 $685,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 22/04/2022 $885,841 $806,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 13/05/2021 $809,016 $727,268 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 25/06/2020 $733,964 $743,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 31/07/2019 10/07/2019 $689,830 $731,249 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/07/2018 12/07/2018 $809,396 $721,295 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 12/07/2017 $565,958 $673,061 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 3/10/2016 $558,156 $491,236 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rush De Silva Trustee 24/02/2022
Julie McKinnon trustee 18/02/2021
Shona Pink-Martin Trustee 11/09/2019
Jacolize Becker Trustee 1/10/2016
Peter McDonald Chair 18/05/2013
Karen Warner Trustee 11/03/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hamish Thomson Trustee 28/05/2024
Roderick Kinross Bent Trustee 28/05/2024
Murray Burton Trustee 9/11/2023
Nicky van de Geest Trustee 31/07/2021
Tom Hadfield Trustee 22/11/2019
Pou Te Rangomau Trustee 8/02/2019
Richard Aitken Trustee 30/11/2018
Amanda Mitchell Officer 7/08/2017
Sheila Monaghan Trustee 30/11/2016
Michelle Ann Jordan Trust Board Member 7/10/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/11/2024 NOC023
18/10/2023 NOC020
8/09/2022 NOC018
8/09/2022 NOC017
14/05/2021 NOC015
7/10/2016 NOC009
7/10/2016 NOC008
5/10/2016 NOC007
19/07/2013 AR006
20/07/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.