Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Prison Care Ministries
Prison Care Ministries Trust
CC22440
9429043122073
Registered

Registration details

4/1/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 16192
Urlich
Hamilton
3245
70 Kent Street
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

(07) 8473115
facebook.com/prisoncareministries


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide an environment for meaningful reintegration. To provide both accommodation and rehabilitative support for men released from prison and those involved in the Criminal Justice System. Achieved by building relationships with prisoners, assisting them to regain independence on release and supporting them as they reintegrate with family and community. To reduce re offending and ensure a safer community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Accommodation / housing

Social services, Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Prisoners, released prisoners and family.)

Entity Structure

Trust Structure: Prison Care Ministries' Trust Deed states the membership of the Trust shall not be less than 3 or exceed 6 in number and that the role of Chairperson must be filled by a Trustee Prison Care Ministries operations are managed by a team of 4 paid employees: 1 full time Manager, 1 fulltime Office Manager, 1 fulltime Reintegration Officer 1 part time Councilor, 1 casual Support person. 12 Volunteers support the team with various activities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 9/29/2023 $482,247 $428,710 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 9/29/2022 $317,296 $330,762 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 9/20/2021 $376,089 $353,926 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 9/30/2020 9/10/2020 $364,746 $389,531 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 9/17/2019 $332,487 $337,768 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2018 9/30/2018 8/22/2018 $348,980 $338,516 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2017 9/30/2017 9/26/2017 $317,679 $323,935 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2016 9/30/2016 9/9/2016 $325,823 $276,963 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2015 9/30/2015 9/4/2015 $229,538 $222,418 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alan Vink Trustee 4/15/2021
Robbie Ahu Trustee 9/15/2016
Alexander Shepherd Trustee 4/2/2008
Jill McMillan Trustee 4/2/2008
Maraenui Taituha Trustee 4/2/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paddy Colley Trustee 4/14/2022
Bruce John McDowall Trustee 2/11/2021
Pam Neilson Trustee 9/13/2020
Geoffrey McMillan Trustee 11/25/2016
Leonard Caley Trustee 10/3/2016
Michael Marama Te Ahuru Trustee 3/31/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/12/2021 NOC027
9/21/2021 NOC024
6/17/2021 NOC023
3/24/2021 NOC022
10/7/2020 NOC021
5/4/2017 NOC014
12/6/2016 NOC013
12/6/2016 NOC012
10/27/2016 NOC011
8/18/2016 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.