Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Museums Trust Incorporated
Experience Wellington
CC22571
9429041926390
Registered

Registration details

6/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 893
Wellington
6140
Level 8
342 Lambton Quay
Wellington
6140

Charity's other details

(04)4710304


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To manage and operate museum and art gallery assets for the benefit of the inhabitants of Wellington, and the public generally.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(provides arts cultural and educational experience), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Incorporated Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December under 2008 Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 25/10/2023 $14,035,724 $14,665,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/12/2022 $14,421,232 $14,417,564 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 13/10/2021 $14,285,510 $14,762,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 9/12/2020 $13,219,444 $13,295,383 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 7/11/2019 $13,602,063 $13,590,250 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 1/10/2018 $12,937,397 $12,990,864 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 23/11/2017 $13,652,847 $13,876,774 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 12/03/2017 $12,162,189 $11,899,761 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 13/10/2015 $12,831,950 $12,535,534 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 13/10/2015 $11,340,600 $11,332,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Councillor Ben McNulty Trustee 1/11/2022
Martin Matthews Trustee 1/07/2022
Suzanne Snively Trustee 1/07/2022
Heather Galbraith Trustee 1/07/2021
Peter Jackson Trustee 1/06/2019
Peter Johnston Trustee 1/06/2019
Jane Wrightson Trustee 1/01/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Diane Calvert Trustee 31/12/2021
Rachel Farrant Trustee 31/12/2021
Jackie Lloyd Trustee 1/07/2020
Patricia Anne Stuart CEO 30/06/2020
Holden Hohaia Trustee 13/03/2019
Jill Wilson Trustee 30/06/2018
Quentin Morris Hay Trustee 31/12/2015
Steven L Tanner Financial Manager 27/11/2013
Ray Ahipene-mercer Trustee 31/10/2013
Alick Shaw Trustee 30/06/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/06/2019 NOC015
2/10/2018 NOC014
3/04/2017 NOC011
18/01/2017 NOC009
20/10/2016 NOC008
15/11/2013 NOC006
7/11/2012 NOC001
28/11/2011 AR004
12/04/2011 AR003
7/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.