Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kiddy Winks Kindy Trust
Kiddy Winks Kindy
CC22574
9429042657880
Registered

Registration details

6/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 75964
Manurewa
Auckland
2243
9 Lupton Road
Manurewa
Auckland
2102

Charity's other details

09 267 4933
https://www.facebook.com/KiddyWinksKindergarten/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a learning environment for preschool children and their families in which Christian values are modelled and taught alongside the knowledge, skills and attitudes that will support children to become lifelong learners.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Kindy Board of Trustees (Governance), Head Teacher and Office Manager (day to day Management) Qualified Trained Teachers working with children.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 1/07/2024 $309,401 $483,906 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/08/2023 25/07/2023 $354,817 $508,158 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 14/08/2022 15/08/2022 $328,551 $386,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $377,352 $388,922 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2020 $353,769 $380,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 27/06/2019 $316,972 $336,448 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $309,282 $329,967 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $317,522 $366,979 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 20/06/2016 $306,115 $306,667 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jason Paul Smith Trustee 16/09/2024
Justin Alexander Lee Chairperson 16/09/2024
Karissa Elizabeth Gordon Secretary 29/07/2024
Kristina Marie Guttenbeil Trustee 4/09/2023
Christine Guttenbeil Treasurer 28/02/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrea Singh Chairperson 15/09/2024
Nicky Smith Trustee 27/08/2024
Richard Toomer Trustee 29/07/2024
Allan Lu Treasurer 18/08/2023
Benjamin Michael Claxton Trustee 28/02/2023
Lisa Carter Secretary 23/08/2022
Benjamin Diack Chairperson 18/05/2021
Vince Kilpatrick Trustee 14/05/2020
Nicole Fransham Treasurer 18/02/2020
Stuart Kelly Trustee 18/02/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/09/2024 NOC041
25/09/2024 NOC040
27/08/2024 NOC039
30/07/2024 NOC037
7/09/2023 NOC035
4/09/2023 NOC034
16/05/2023 NOC032
26/08/2022 NOC031
26/08/2022 NOC029
29/06/2021 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.