pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The WB Sheath Foundation
CC22584
N/A
Registered

Registration details

6/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 15349
New Lynn
Auckland
640
3047 Great North Road
New Lynn
Auckland
600

Charity's other details

09 827 6094


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide funding for Education within the SPCA.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Grant Funding for educational & training purposes), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Health, Care / protection of animals, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Animals

Entity Structure

There are three board members who govern, they are also Board members of the RNZSPCA National Office.
The Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 14/12/2021 $5,369 $100,000
31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $15,022 $100,000
31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $16,932 $0
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $12,856 $0
31/12/2017 19/12/2018 $9,011 $9,011
30/06/2017 19/06/2017 $17,548 $17,548
30/06/2016 14/09/2016 $22,313 $22,313
30/06/2015 28/06/2015 $21,004 $21,004
30/06/2014 7/07/2014 $24,970 $24,970
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 6 months from 1 January 2017 - 30 June 2017.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Broderick RNZSPCA Board member 27/10/2017
Andrea Midgen National CEO 28/07/2017
Gordon Trainer RNZSPCA National Board Member 24/06/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Marie Hall RNZSPCA National Board Member 27/10/2017
Clive Poles Smith RNZSPCA National Board Member 28/07/2017
Jenifer Maud Prattley Trustee 27/07/2014
Peter William Mason Trustee 27/07/2014
Robyn Jane Kippenberger Trustee 27/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2018 NOC009
28/11/2018 NOC007
31/07/2017 NOC006
14/09/2016 NOC004

Charity Documents