Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Canterbury Communications Trust
CCT trading as PlainsFM 96.9
CC22633
9429042774983
Registered

Registration details

7/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

154 Madras Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 3657997


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide accessible, professional broadcasting and media facilities for use by local agencies, individuals and organisations to produce content of interest to the Canterbury Community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Radio Broadcaster)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, International activities, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, People Under-represented in Mainstream Media

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 17/12/2024 $486,145 $502,541 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 14/12/2023 $463,229 $528,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 19/12/2022 $479,984 $496,952 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 19/12/2021 $475,417 $465,007 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $540,072 $477,125 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 21/12/2019 $381,668 $420,539 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 30/12/2018 $391,542 $361,520 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 8/01/2018 $378,503 $355,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 25/07/2017 $353,829 $383,286 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/12/2015 $386,158 $395,937 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Stephen Newell trustee 24/01/2024
Hero Modares Trustee 17/08/2022
Dorota Szymanska-Prokop Trustee 24/01/2018
Garry Thomas Trustee 26/07/2017
Karen Neill Trustee 17/02/2009
James Ayers Chairperson 29/04/2008
Darrell Higson Trustee 20/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Te Marino Lenihan Trustee 1/05/2024
Tony Simons Trustee 31/10/2023
Shirish Paranjape Trustee 6/04/2022
George Nelson Trustee 23/07/2020
John Milligan Trustee 30/09/2018
Shirish Parajape Trustee 25/07/2018
Lynne Te Aika Trustee 26/04/2017
Peter Gamble Trustee 25/01/2017
Katy Gosset Trustee 31/10/2016
Helen Gatonyi Trustee 31/07/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/08/2024 NOC026
22/07/2024 NOC025
12/08/2020 NOC019
12/08/2020 NOC018
16/01/2020 NOC017
2/10/2018 NOC014
25/07/2018 NOC013
2/05/2018 NOC012
8/01/2018 NOC011
25/07/2017 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.