Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Write On School for Young Writers Incorporated
Write On
CC22672
9429042612346
Registered

Registration details

7/04/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Christchurch School for Young Writers Inc 8/04/2008
Write On School for Young Writers Incorporated 24/05/2021

Address for service

121A Nayland Street
Sumner
Christchurch
8081

Charity's other details

027 3289623


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the school are to promote, develop and encourage writing among children and young people in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Writing School)

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 19/06/2024 $157,781 $155,766 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/05/2023 $151,955 $156,609 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 29/06/2022 $145,387 $147,380 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 23/06/2021 $148,391 $148,546 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 22/06/2020 $159,308 $170,437 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 31/07/2019 24/06/2019 $142,559 $135,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 27/06/2018 $155,467 $159,857 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 19/06/2017 $140,206 $151,819 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 23/06/2016 $120,531 $124,489 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Hill Committee Member 25/05/2024
Jenny Sullivan Secretary 25/05/2024
Kieran Scott Committee Member 25/05/2024
Philomena Johnson Committee Member 25/05/2024
Zane Shaskey Treasurer 27/05/2023
Heather McQuillan Director 1/01/2018
Margaret Wilson-Boyle Chairperson 6/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gregory Taylor Committee member 25/05/2024
Chris Milne Treasurer 27/05/2023
Lisa Danielle Cowie Secretary 27/05/2023
David Paul Hill Committee Member 28/05/2022
Ira Febriana Committee Member 28/05/2022
Julie Lassen committee member 28/05/2022
Karen Michelle Brown Committee Member 28/05/2022
Juliet Milne Committee Member 22/05/2021
Lauren Steel secretary 20/06/2020
Srimala Kumarapaapillai Committee Member 20/06/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/05/2023 NOC020
24/06/2022 NOC017
24/05/2021 NOC015
4/02/2020 NOC013
23/06/2016 NOC009
16/06/2015 NOC008
11/06/2014 NOC007
25/06/2013 AR006
25/06/2012 AR005
28/05/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.