Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Baptist Missionary Society
Arotahi
CC22737
9429042679332
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 12149
Penrose
Auckland
1642
473 Great South Road
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

+64 9 526 8444
http://facebook.com/arotahi.org

Asia

Bangladesh, China, India, Thailand


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We seek to encourage, mobilise and resource NZ Baptists individuals and churches - to wherever in the world that God may direct.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

General public

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28/02/09 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28/02/10.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 29/12/2024 $1,819,875 $1,810,310 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2023 10/05/2024 22/04/2024 $1,563,651 $1,667,188 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2022 28/02/2023 14/11/2022 $1,376,218 $1,211,792 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2021 28/02/2022 22/02/2022 $1,729,703 $1,406,635 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2020 28/02/2021 16/12/2020 $1,553,721 $1,810,192 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2019 29/02/2020 27/02/2020 $2,191,037 $2,149,782 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2018 28/02/2019 18/03/2019 $2,286,871 $2,290,679 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2017 28/02/2018 4/04/2018 $3,008,669 $3,312,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2017 $2,276,754 $2,257,438 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/08/2015 29/02/2016 29/02/2016 $2,453,888 $2,453,888 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 10 months from 1 September 2023 to 30 June 2024.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Allan Taylor President of Baptist Union 1/11/2024
Debbie Cunningham Council Member 1/11/2024
Eduardo Mendonca Council Member 3/11/2023
Susan Osborne Council Member 3/11/2023
Stuart Leslie Hastings Council Member 15/08/2023
Robyn Carol Duncan Chair 10/02/2023
Bradley Vaughn Nicolson Council Member 4/11/2022
Katie Kingsthwaite Council Member 18/02/2022
Ravi Musuku Council Member 11/11/2021
Charles R Hewlett National Leader 3/12/2020
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brian Robert Cochran Council Member 1/11/2024
Denny Wilson-Takaanini Council Member 1/11/2024
David Allen Council Member 3/11/2023
Rewai Te Kahu Council Member 3/11/2023
Sharon Dando Council Member 3/11/2023
Nigel Cottle Council Member 31/10/2022
Sharon Scarrow Council Member 31/12/2021
Ann E C Borquist Council Member 16/11/2021
David W Moko Council Member 16/11/2021
Raewyn P Moodie Council Member 12/11/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2025 NOC048
15/01/2025 NOC047
26/07/2024 NOC045
4/12/2023 NOC043
31/07/2023 NOC040
27/06/2023 NOC039
27/06/2023 NOC038
15/02/2023 NOC037
14/11/2022 NOC035
9/11/2022 NOC034
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.