Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Asthma And Respiratory Foundation of New Zealand (Incorporated) Te Taumatua Huango, Mate Ha O Aotearoa Incorporated
CC22906
9429042583646
Deregistered
07/08/2017
Other

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Asthma And Respiratory Foundation of New Zealand (Incorporated) Te Taumatua Huango, Mate Ha O Aotearoa Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

13/04/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 6/08/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another
Registered 13/04/2008

Address for service

PO Box 1459
Wellington
6140
LEVEL 3 Ranchhod Tower
39 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 499 4592
04 499 4594


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision: Better Breathing, Better Living. Mission: Better respiratory health for all New Zealanders through: • Advocating to government to place respiratory disease as a higher priority • Education and training respiratory health professionals on best practices • Researching areas of respiratory health including prevention, diagnosis and treatment • Raising awareness about respiratory disease and its effects in New Zealand • Increasing quality and quantity of information available to those who suffer from respiratory illness

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, People With Respiratory Illnesses

Entity Structure

The Asthma & Respiratory Foundation of New Zealand (Inc) is governed by a Board with a President and other members elected by members at the Annual General Meeting. Other support comes from board members, office staff and volunteers assigned to various project groups and committees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 27/02/2017 $1,923,019 $1,774,700 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 15/12/2015 $1,629,391 $1,562,483 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 24/11/2014 $1,511,629 $1,480,942 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 18/12/2013 $1,571,891 $1,536,918 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 19/12/2012 $1,144,460 $1,555,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 19/12/2011 $1,428,334 $1,306,288 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 22/12/2010 $1,265,237 $1,207,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 23/11/2009 $1,129,843 $1,441,195 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Wills Chief Executive Officer 16/07/2015
John Knight Board Chair 18/08/2014
Matthew Allen Board Member 18/08/2014
Philip Aldridge Board Member 18/08/2014
Cheryl Davies Board Member 30/06/2014
Janice Kuka Board Member 19/09/2013
Louise Te Hinepouri Jurlina Board member 1/10/2010
Ruth Elizabeth Gardener Board Member 13/10/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tristram Ingham Medical Advisor 1/07/2016
Kyle Perrin Medical Advisor 4/03/2016
Lois Meneer Board member 4/03/2016
Angela Francis Chief Executive 15/05/2015
George Ian Town Board President 18/08/2014
William Nicholas Smith Board Member 4/09/2013
Tuwhakairiora Williams Board Member 15/02/2013
Robert John Hancox Board Member 31/12/2012
Gilbert James Taurua Board Member 4/03/2011
Jane Lucille Patterson Executive Director 18/02/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/10/2015 NOC014
24/09/2013 NOC010
12/12/2012 AR005
29/03/2012 NOC009
29/11/2011 NOC008
22/12/2010 AR003
3/11/2010 NOC007
28/10/2010 NOC006
15/09/2009 NOC005
16/02/2009 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.