pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Religious Society Of Friends (Quakers) Yearly Meeting Of Aotearoa New Zealand
Te Haahi Tuuhauwiri
CC23099
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

115 Mount Eden Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The promotion of religion for the public benefit in accordance with the faith and practice of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers)

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Education / training / research, International activities, Peace and reconciliation

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

30 local worship groups are the basic unit and these are organized into 7 Monthly Meetings which comprise the national body called Yearly Meeting.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Quaker Peace and Service Trust CC23122
Religious Society of Friends Aotearoa New Zealand Trust Board CC26122
Whanganui Educational Settlement Trust ("WEST") of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) in Aotearoa NZ, Te Hahi Tuhauwiri CC26293

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/05/2023 $344,595 $575,631
30/06/2022 27/06/2022 $480,417 $464,767
30/06/2021 24/06/2021 $875,520 $473,283
30/06/2020 25/06/2020 $1,082,456 $919,411
30/06/2019 25/06/2019 $386,604 $533,009
30/09/2018 24/09/2018 $541,995 $469,634
30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $1,281,491 $586,120
30/06/2016 24/07/2016 $111,267 $155,624
30/06/2015 19/05/2015 $677,474 $719,346
30/06/2014 11/06/2014 $257,117 $229,803

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alistair John Hall Co-Clerk 17/05/2021
Marjorie Anne Hall Co-Clerk 17/05/2021
Mark Richard Hodson Treasurer 17/01/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lesley Young Clerk 17/05/2021
Murray Short Yearly Meeting Clerk 28/05/2018
Graham Wood Treasurer 17/01/2018
Elizabeth Duke Co-Clerk 11/05/2015
Elizabeth Thompson Co-Clerk 11/05/2015
Claire Robson Gregory Co-clerk 14/05/2012
Linley Clow Gregory Co-clerk 14/05/2012
Elizabeth Duke Yearly meeting treasurer 31/12/2009
William Robinson Yearly meeting clerk 12/07/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/03/2023 NOC023
30/05/2021 NOC020
29/05/2021 NOC019
24/06/2019 NOC016
1/06/2018 NOC014
21/03/2018 NOC013
16/05/2016 NOC009
6/07/2015 NOC008
2/06/2013 AR006
26/05/2012 AR005

Charity Documents