Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Maraetotara Tree Trust
CC23200
9429043186372
Registered

Registration details

20/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 975
Hastings
4156
28 Kaiangaroa Place
RD 12
Bay View
Napier
4104

Charity's other details

(06)8366610
https://www.facebook.com/maraetotaratreetrust
https://www.instagram.com/maraetotaratreetrust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To preserve Hawke's Bay's unique character by the protection of riparian waterways and wetlands. More specifically, to improve the water quality and biodiversity of the Maraetotara River by removing willow trees and replacing them with indigenous plantings.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Clearing the length of the Maraetotara River of invasive willows, fencing the riparian strip and planting in native species)

Environment / conservation

Employment, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, Family / whanau, Local authorities

Entity Structure

Charitable trust with eight trustees, including chairperson and secretary. Independent treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 20/04/2023 $68,362 $55,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 10/05/2022 $68,964 $62,666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 26/04/2021 $58,104 $43,641 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 24/05/2020 $31,929 $42,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 16/06/2019 $81,690 $68,532 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 15/06/2018 $86,593 $71,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 24/05/2017 $49,731 $56,935 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 6/10/2016 $79,963 $45,595 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 29/02/2016 $55,244 $62,781 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joshua Joseph Lynch Trustee 21/03/2019
Mark Roper Trustee 19/07/2018
Alan Vernon Berry Treasurer 21/04/2017
Lisl Anne Prendergast Trustee 28/11/2014
Richard Desmond Stone Trustee 28/11/2014
Kepa George Toa Trustee 1/04/2014
Hylton John McDermott Trustee 21/04/2008
Alec Olsen Trustee 16/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Patrick Dean Turley Trustee 23/08/2022
Raewyn Ricketts Trustee 21/03/2019
Jenifer T Jane Trustee 17/05/2018
Martin A'Court Trustee 30/11/2017
Folker Liebenow Trustee 23/06/2016
Keith Frederick Taylor Trustee 2/11/2014
Kepa George Toa Co-Ordinator 1/04/2014
Anthony Wilson Trustee 31/03/2014
Rodney Gallen Trustee 3/03/2012
Paratene Te Huia Trustee 19/01/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/10/2023 NOC032
15/06/2019 NOC026
25/05/2019 NOC025
20/10/2018 NOC024
18/06/2018 NOC023
25/05/2017 NOC021
20/05/2017 NOC019
3/09/2016 NOC016
29/07/2016 NOC015
27/07/2016 NOC014
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.