Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Horowhenua Branch Of The Royal New Zealand Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Incorporated
CC23224
9429042874591
Deregistered
28/02/2019

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of The Horowhenua Branch Of The Royal New Zealand Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

20/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 15349
New Lynn
Auckland
0640
169 Mako Mako Road
Levin 5510
New Lynn
Levin
5510

Charity's other details

09 827 6094


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance animal welfare and prevent cruelty

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To advance animal welfare and prevent cruelty)

Care / protection of animals

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Animals

Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

On 1 November 2017 this SPCA centre voted to become part of 'One' SPCA (RNZSPCA - CC 22705, Inc No. 218546). All centres were previously seperate Incorporated Societies. See the Charity Documents section for this Centre, which has details in press release. Queries to board.secretary@spca.nz

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 8/09/2016 $232,114 $233,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 22/11/2015 $229,393 $213,873 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 31/03/2015 $288,210 $211,391 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 2/07/2013 $66,517 $158,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 25/07/2012 $44,170 $132,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 9/08/2011 $46,614 $95,843 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2009 30/06/2010 12/11/2010 $122,982 $83,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gordon Trainer Board Member 12/09/2015
Robyn O'Fee Board Member 17/05/2015
Carol Martin Board Member 2/05/2015
Rachel Hucklebridge Board Member 2/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Clive Poles Smith Board Member 31/12/2017
Marie Hall Board Member 31/12/2017
Sean Cooney Board Member 31/12/2017
Richard Odom CEO 31/07/2017
Francine Shields Board Member 30/06/2017
Emanuel Kalafatelis Board Member 30/05/2017
Heather Wallace Financial Controller 30/09/2016
Sara Elliott-Warren Board Member 27/05/2016
Robyn Jane Kippenberger National CEO - Administrator 2/10/2013
Adele Legge Secretary 18/12/2008
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/03/2019 NOC010
3/10/2018 NOC007
8/09/2016 NOC006
31/03/2015 NOC005
25/07/2012 AR005
3/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.