Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Edenvale Trust Board
Edenvale Rest Home
CC23236
9429043170531
Registered

Registration details

20/04/2008
September 30

Address for service

9 Edenvale Crescent
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024
Edenvale Rest Home
9 Edenvale Crescent
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

09 6306482
09 6389317


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provision of rest home and hospital care services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Health

Religious activities

Older people

General public

Entity Structure

Governing body is a Board of Trustees. Beneath this is a management team at the rest home

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2024 31/03/2025 11/12/2024 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2023 31/03/2024 12/12/2024 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2022 31/03/2023 19/04/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2021 31/12/2022 17/04/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2020 31/03/2021 5/03/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2019 31/03/2020 24/02/2020 $3,282,736 $2,749,218 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2018 31/03/2019 12/03/2019 $3,007,560 $2,739,590 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2017 31/03/2018 26/03/2018 $2,805,855 $2,493,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2016 31/03/2017 6/03/2017 $2,572,233 $2,439,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2015 31/03/2016 21/04/2016 $2,537,383 $2,309,502 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Joseph Setters Trustee 21/04/2008
Donald Campbell Davidson Trustee 21/04/2008
Graham Alfred Walton Trustee 21/04/2008
John Kenneth Setters Trustee 21/04/2008
Rodger George Yeoman Trustee 21/04/2008
Anthony Elliott Crawford Trustee 8/02/2005

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/03/2012 AR005

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.