Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Turuki Health Care Charitable Trust
Trading as Turuki Health Care
CC23265
9429042810179
Registered

Registration details

21/04/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Putea O Pua Trust Maori Midwives Collective 22/04/2008
Turuki Health Care Charitable Trust 2/05/2008

Address for service

PO Box 43002
Mangere
Auckland
2153
2
32 Canning Crescent
Mangere
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details

09 275 5788
09 275 5711
Turuki Health Care


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

An accredited specialist of services to women, babies and whanau

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Health Care

Health

Education / training / research, Social services

Other (please state)

(Communities in South Auckland who have high and complex health and social needs), Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Turuki Health Care offers a range of GP clinic services and wider health and social services to communities across South Auckland and Panmure and Glen Innes

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Turuki Health Care Limited CC61190

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 28/02/2025 19/12/2024 $33,892,090 $33,700,035 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 29/02/2024 21/05/2024 $32,135,764 $31,384,852 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 5/05/2023 8/05/2023 $31,526,792 $26,988,103 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/03/2022 21/04/2022 $20,289,075 $19,627,002 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/01/2021 4/02/2021 $16,940,476 $16,332,508 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $10,721,620 $10,296,967 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 21/12/2018 $9,109,046 $8,896,844 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/12/2017 $8,239,388 $7,904,705 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 29/05/2017 $7,850,290 $8,072,151 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 11/01/2016 $7,792,609 $7,790,267 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eddie Bluegum Trustee 1/06/2021
Philip Tane Trustee 19/10/2015
William Richard Takerei Trustee 14/10/2002
Colin David Mantell Trustee 11/12/2001
Janice Kuka Trustee 10/09/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Adrian Dolly Rewha Trustee 22/05/2018
Sonny Pimipi Rauwhero Board Member / Kaumatua 19/10/2015
Haki Waikato Trustee 17/11/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2021 NOC011
11/01/2016 NOC005
22/03/2012 AR004
15/06/2011 AR003
14/12/2009 AR002
26/08/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.