pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Waka Pounamu Outrigger Canoe Club Charitable Trust
CC23373
9429043080489
Registered

Registration details

22/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

74 Avonside Drive
Linwood
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

0273124187
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/323524830140/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide and promote a forum to encourage the pursuit and enjoyment of sports, leisure, recreation activities for youth in Canterbury and their Whanau, Iwi and Hapu in association with their social and cultural development and growth..

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Sports Organisation )

Sport / recreation

Environment / conservation, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 19/09/2023 $135,225 $90,957
30/09/2022 28/09/2022 $110,473 $66,979
30/09/2021 7/09/2021 $28,419 $23,538
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $44,689 $33,720
30/09/2019 24/02/2020 $37,036 $38,202
30/09/2018 24/02/2020 $67,953 $41,736
30/09/2017 9/09/2017 $37,765 $42,564
30/09/2016 26/10/2016 $14,241 $14,750
30/09/2015 6/10/2016 $13,651 $17,550
30/09/2014 6/10/2016 $32,531 $17,977

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adam John Sharlick Treasurer 24/07/2022
Elisabeth Lalahi Committee Member 24/07/2022
Hanna Sorby Secretary 24/07/2022
Iaean Cranwell Committee Member 24/07/2022
Ilene Te Whetu Committee Member 24/07/2022
Matt Jermyn Committee Member 24/07/2022
Craig Aaron Pauling President/Chair 1/07/2020
Christine John Vice President/Chair 18/07/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Georgia Moana Bell Committee Member 25/08/2023
Kura Kanavatoa Committee Member 25/08/2023
Merryn Herlihy Committee member 25/08/2023
Merryn Gae Herlihy Treasurer 24/07/2022
Anna Claire O'Grady Secretary 23/07/2022
Hanna Ruth Sorby Secretary 1/07/2020
Anita Munro Secretary 31/07/2019
Alex Beaton Chair 1/07/2019
Ingrid Kaptein Secretary 25/07/2017
Quentin Clough Chairperson 25/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/12/2022 NOC019
30/09/2020 NOC016
13/10/2016 NOC010
7/07/2016 NOC009
14/10/2013 NOC005
27/09/2013 AR006
7/12/2012 NOC004
4/12/2012 NOC003
27/04/2012 AR004
24/09/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents