Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mountains To Sea Conservation Trust
Nga Maunga Ki Te Moana Conservation Trust
CC23406
9429043001552
Registered

Registration details

23/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

8 First Avenue
Avenues
Whangārei
0110

Charity's other details

0272434818
www.facebook.com/mountainstosea
www.mountainstosea.org.nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Northland-based Mountains to Sea Conservation Trust was established in 2002, as a charitable umbrella and support organisation for the Experiencing Marine Reserves (EMR) marine education and Whitebait Connection (WBC) freshwater education programmes. These are both leading models in education for sustainability in Aotearoa/New Zealand. The Trust sees education as a vital part of society and central to all environmental restoration. Both programmes involve young people, their parents and the wider community. Our programmes reinforce simple concepts such as the uniqueness of our freshwater and marine biodiversity and provide an active focus on conservation of these environments through education and action. Our goal is to empower and support communities to achieve marine and freshwater conservation through science based experiential programmes, resources, projects and community engagement.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Education programmes

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Employment, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Science Research, promote conservation

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Biodiversity

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 15/11/2024 14/11/2024 $7,200,632 $7,053,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 29/10/2023 $1,587,571 $1,640,216 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 31/10/2022 $962,087 $942,320 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2022 $722,523 $781,389 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 26/03/2021 29/03/2021 $785,231 $799,813 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 29/10/2019 $602,119 $578,407 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $602,119 $578,407 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 31/10/2017 $597,334 $578,301 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 15/12/2016 $399,222 $379,513 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Finley Robert John Duncan Trustee 31/07/2023
Patrick McCann Trustee 31/07/2023
Victoria Beatriz Vajda Bartolomei Trustee 31/07/2023
Sheila Taylor Trustee 23/09/2021
Katrina Lee Goddard Trustee 21/01/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jean-Louis Ecochard Trustee 17/09/2024
Olivier Ball Trustee 30/04/2024
Arla Marie Kerr Trustee 3/04/2024
Matthew Garnet Keene Trustee 11/04/2023
Geoffrey Leon Butturini Trustee 29/09/2022
Hilton James Leith Trustee 29/09/2022
Manuel Springford Trustee 29/09/2022
Eden Lorraine Hakaraia Trustee 23/09/2021
Vincent Carlyle Kerr Trustee 14/11/2020
Kim Pamela Boyle Trustee 26/09/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2024 NOC031
21/08/2024 NOC030
19/12/2023 NOC029
17/04/2023 NOC027
13/06/2022 NOC025
11/02/2022 NOC023
15/06/2021 NOC022
1/12/2020 NOC020
16/08/2019 NOC018
14/11/2018 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.