pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Seniornet (Manawatu) Incorporated
CC23644
9429042950134
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Seniornet Palmerston North Incorporated 1/05/2008
Seniornet (Manawatu) Incorporated 1/03/2021

Address for service

C/- Treasurer
1 Wincanton Place
Awapuni
Palmerston North
44412

Charity's other details

021 1973476
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/SeniorNetManawatu


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide older adults education for and access to computer technologies to enhance their lives

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provide education on new technologies)

Education / training / research

Older people

Entity Structure

Committee Structure

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 4/04/2022 $7,809 $5,424
30/06/2021 14/03/2021 $9,201 $5,980
30/06/2020 4/06/2020 $9,988 $15,182
30/06/2019 22/04/2019 $11,105 $15,548
30/06/2018 4/04/2018 $12,690 $19,235
30/06/2017 3/08/2017 $12,545 $16,958
30/06/2016 5/05/2016 $15,680 $20,383
30/06/2015 17/04/2015 $21,033 $26,183
30/06/2014 14/04/2014 $20,464 $33,809

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Lawrence Committee Member 10/03/2021
Kevin Fletcher Committee Member 10/03/2020
John Gibsone President 13/03/2019
David Illingham Secretary 14/03/2018
Marie Betty Start Treasurer 8/03/2017
Regionald George Romans Vice President 24/03/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chrissy Thompson Committe 10/03/2021
Valerie Yeoman Committee 15/04/2020
Allan Walters Committee Member 20/03/2019
Chrissy Hoys President 31/12/2017
Lynette Dell Committee Member 31/12/2017
Micheal Lawrence Vice President 31/12/2017
Rosalind Carole Taylor Committee Member 31/12/2017
Shona Jorgensen Committee Member 31/12/2017
Charles Hunt Treasurer 8/03/2017
Jacquline Marchant Committee Member 8/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/02/2022 NOC023
4/02/2021 NOC020
17/03/2020 NOC018
3/05/2019 NOC017
4/04/2019 NOC015
21/03/2018 NOC013
5/05/2016 NOC010
19/05/2015 NOC009
14/04/2014 NOC007
30/04/2013 AR005

Charity Documents