Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Fred Hollows Foundation (NZ)
CC23722
9429042868637
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

Private Bag 99909
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
Level 22, Huawei Centre
120 Albert Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09 304 0524
09 379 7178
@fredhollowsnz
http://twitter.com/FredHollowsNZ
https://www.instagram.com/nzfredhollows/

Oceania

Fiji, Kiribati, Marshall Islands, Nauru, Niue, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We work to end avoidable blindness and vision impairment in the Pacific. We advocate for the right of all people to high-quality and affordable eye care. We strive for eye care to be locally-led and accessible to all. In doing this we continue Fred's legacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides eye health services and trains eye health workers in the Pacific )

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, International activities, People with disabilities

General public

Older people, People with disabilities, Health Workers

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Fred Hollows Foundation NZ Pacific Eye Institute Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
The Fred Hollows Foundation NZ SI Trust Board Inc. (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
The Fred Hollows Foundation PNG Inc. (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 21/05/2024 $16,850,738 $16,337,240 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 17/05/2023 $13,908,301 $16,062,241 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 8/06/2022 $13,809,351 $10,119,874 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/05/2021 $11,431,141 $8,757,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 21/05/2020 $11,663,657 $10,421,423 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 17/04/2019 $13,035,681 $13,455,727 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/05/2018 $12,624,176 $9,971,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 23/05/2017 $10,593,726 $10,064,613 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $11,685,966 $12,450,388 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Maria Goretti Tai Trustee 24/02/2025
Roslyn Elizabeth Morauta Trustee 23/06/2023
Leopino Sosefo Foliaki Trustee 31/01/2023
William James Cunningham Trustee 4/05/2022
Audrey Aumua Chief Executive Officer 18/01/2021
Viliami Siosifa Moala Taumoepeau Trustee 10/04/2019
Sharon Anne Orr Chief Operating Officer 6/03/2017
Martin Raymond Enright Trustee 23/02/2017
Sir Maarten Laurens Wevers Deputy Chairperson 21/03/2013
Kathleen Claudia Watson Trustee 21/02/2013
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicholas Manu Mantell Trustee 5/04/2023
Markerita Kim Poutasi Trustee 22/08/2022
Debra Mary Delores Sorensen Trustee 23/11/2021
Charles Ninian McGhee Trustee 6/11/2021
Gordon Sanderson Trustee 5/07/2017
Franceska Banga Trustee 24/11/2016
Robert George Mappin Fenwick Trustee 21/05/2015
John McElhinney Trustee 15/08/2013
Brent Graham Impey Trustee 15/11/2012
Colin Tukuitonga Trutee 15/11/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/05/2024 NOC038
1/11/2023 NOC036
6/10/2023 NOC035
19/06/2023 NOC034
27/01/2023 NOC032
5/12/2022 NOC031
15/09/2022 NOC030
4/05/2022 NOC028
3/05/2022 NOC027
9/12/2021 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.