Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kia Puāwai
CC23952
9429042939924
Registered

Registration details

5/05/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Youth Horizons Trust 6/05/2008
Youth Horizons Trust | Kia Puawai 15/11/2017
Kia Puāwai 10/01/2024

Address for service

PO Box 22365
Otahuhu
Auckland
1640
42 Vestey Drive
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1060

Charity's other details

09 5730954
https://www.facebook.com/kiapuawai.nz
https://nz.linkedin.com/company/kiapuawai


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To draw from te ao Māori and te ao Tauiwi knowledge to inform specialised programmes for the prevention, treatment and management of social, behavioural, emotional, mental health or developmental issues so to strengthen wellbeing, mana and wairua of tamariki, rangatahi and their whānau.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Kia Puāwai is a registered charity in New Zealand and is a public benefit entity for the purposes of financial reporting in accordance with the Financial Reporting Act (2013).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/11/2023 $21,606,197 $20,980,232 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 17/11/2022 $21,283,435 $21,559,741 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 21/12/2021 $21,462,811 $20,812,081 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $22,196,921 $21,308,058 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 30/12/2019 $21,772,645 $20,754,848 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 3/12/2018 $20,211,246 $19,687,160 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $18,856,675 $18,231,933 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 28/12/2016 $18,309,436 $17,866,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 4/11/2015 $17,946,596 $17,619,410 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 1/12/2014 $15,389,659 $15,045,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael James Munnelly Trustee 18/10/2023
Glenis Philip-Barbara Trustee 19/04/2023
Julia Anne Steenson Trustee 15/02/2023
Kaine Lee Thompson Trustee 15/02/2023
Tania Anne Thomas Chair 20/04/2022
Patrick Michael Baker Trustee 4/11/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony Rangi Kake Chair 5/12/2023
Michael James Minnelly Trustee 18/10/2023
Alison Jane Taylor Trustee 16/08/2023
Christopher Bruce Harris Trustee 19/04/2023
Apaula Julia Ioane Trustee 15/06/2022
Heather McDowell Trustee 1/06/2021
Ophir Louisa Cassidy Trustee 16/04/2021
John Rodney Watts Chair/Trustee 16/07/2019
Deanne La-verne King Trustee 17/04/2019
Myra Mains Trustee 17/01/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/03/2024 NOC046
10/01/2024 NOC045
12/12/2023 NOC044
5/12/2023 NOC043
16/08/2023 NOC041
17/07/2023 NOC040
2/02/2023 NOC039
22/06/2022 NOC037
26/04/2022 NOC036
15/06/2021 NOC033
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.