Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sexual Abuse Support and Healing (SASH-Nelson) Incorporated
SASH-Nelson
CC24107
9429042694953
Registered

Registration details

8/05/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Nelson Rape and Sexual Abuse Network Incorporated 9/05/2008
Sexual Abuse Support and Healing (SASH-Nelson) Incorporated 4/02/2010

Address for service

144 Collingwood Street
Nelson
7010

Charity's other details

(03) 548 2407


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We believe people have a right to live in a society free from sexual abuse and violence. We aim to assist people by empowering them towards healing and promote autonomy, self-determination, personal growth, pride, confidence and self-esteem.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Counselling

Other (please state)

(Individuals seeking help and support having suffered sexual abuse. We support everyone regardless of age, gender, cultural and belief.)

Entity Structure

We are an Incorporated Society, which is run by a Governance Board and a Manager.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 8/10/2024 $2,683,278 $2,241,734 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/02/2024 $2,490,340 $1,815,696 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/02/2024 $2,055,529 $1,511,435 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 1/09/2022 $1,834,208 $1,285,497 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 19/06/2023 $876,064 $710,678 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 30/09/2019 $632,804 $661,504 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 2/10/2018 $642,278 $610,279 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/11/2017 $590,008 $504,513 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 31/10/2016 $433,272 $429,954 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 9/12/2015 $258,760 $269,584 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kirste Anne Nalder General Manager 4/02/2024
Sally McBride Board Member 1/09/2023
Tim Shaw Board Member 1/05/2023
Lavinia Elizabeth Askin Board Member 23/11/2022
Vanessa Stutz Treasurer 18/08/2021
Maria Takai Chair 21/07/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emma Jane Brazendale Manager 9/02/2024
Dana King Chair 31/12/2023
Debbie Fisher Board Member 20/02/2023
Kirsten Hopkins Board Member 27/10/2022
Louise Staite Board Member 30/04/2022
Leslie Mary Jones Board Member 31/08/2021
Cas Gillespie Chairperson 30/11/2020
Venus Sood Board Member 26/02/2020
Kay Chapman Chair Person 31/08/2019
Lee-Anne Ketchen Manager 31/08/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2024 NOC036
18/07/2022 NOC033
9/03/2021 NOC031
6/01/2020 NOC029
21/02/2018 NOC026
9/05/2017 NOC023
7/11/2016 NOC021
31/10/2016 NOC019
10/12/2015 NOC018
31/07/2015 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.