Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Riccarton Community Church Trust
Riccarton Community Church
CC24291
9429047796171
Registered

Registration details

12/05/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Riccarton Community Church 13/05/2008
Riccarton Community Church Trust 13/11/2019

Address for service

44 Elizabeth Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details

03 3488507
03 3489337
Riccarton Community Church


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To see our city become a place of Christ's transforming hope for the world. We seek to do this by evangelising our city; satisfying the needs of the poor, oppressed and disadvantaged; building believers to maturity; and impacting the nations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Other (please state)

(The Church Congregation), Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 12/08/2024 $1,036,109 $909,339 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/10/2023 13/02/2024 $1,011,782 $987,586 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/09/2022 19/10/2022 $1,115,837 $871,757 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/09/2021 14/10/2021 $941,035 $747,670 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 9/10/2020 $825,735 $782,219 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/09/2019 13/12/2019 $776,486 $642,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/07/2018 25/07/2018 $715,241 $670,672 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 28/07/2017 $702,113 $636,953 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 18/05/2016 $666,483 $549,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrea Hotter Trustee 23/01/2025
Caleb Meyer Trustee 23/01/2025
Mark Styles Treasurer 1/02/2018
James Sheat Elder 30/04/2016
Bevan Burgess Elder 1/01/2013
Alan Robert Aitken Elder 28/06/2006
Philip Harold Stedman Elder 27/11/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sonya Nuku Elder 31/08/2023
Geoff Wallis Elder 31/12/2021
Mark Aaron Paul Treasurer 1/02/2018
Michael Tan Elder 30/04/2016
Andrew Malcolm Elder 1/01/2014
Ian Stanton Wells Elder 1/01/2014
Wayne Blythe Elder 20/05/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/01/2025 NOC017
27/05/2016 NOC007
19/05/2015 NOC006
15/05/2013 AR006
30/06/2010 AR003
19/11/2008 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.