Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Association Of Christian Spiritual Directors Incorporated
Association Of Christian Spiritual Directors In Aotearoa New Zealand
CC24455
9429043149032
Registered

Registration details

15/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 17727
Sumner
Christchurch
8840

Charity's other details

027 2890383
https://www.facebook.com/acsdnz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide religious services/activities, spiritual direction. To promote and encourage spiritual direction, support spiritual directors in professional practice, biennial training event.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Education / training / research

General public

Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Association of Christian Spiritual Directors Inc. Reg CC24455. 1 part-time employee who receives an honorarium for approx 300 hrs p.a. Six-member executive, average about 6 hours per week. Cash accounting.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 February 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 February 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 12/04/2024 $17,823 $13,888 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 15/07/2023 $19,103 $36,547 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 26/07/2022 $35,623 $14,351 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 31/08/2021 $19,675 $12,119 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/06/2020 $64,172 $60,454 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/09/2019 $16,377 $17,868 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 12/08/2018 $52,810 $40,751 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/08/2017 $13,191 $9,808 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/08/2016 $12,055 $18,917 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Colin Graham Renouf Member of executive, elected 22/07/2023
Jennifer Mary Dawson Member of Executive 22/07/2023
Mary Watiri Maina member of Executive 22/07/2023
Patricia Anne Chrisp Executive member 4/09/2021
Lew Marsh Executive member 5/10/2019
Steve Tollestrup Executive member 5/10/2019
Rosemary Anne Neave Secretary Treasurer 17/01/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amy Armstrong Executive member 4/09/2023
Diana Woods Exec Member 4/09/2023
Jeannie Martin Blaker Executive member 4/09/2023
Bev Phillips Executive Member 4/09/2021
Jeffrey Whittaker Executive Member 5/10/2019
Glenda Prosser Executive member 3/09/2017
Philippa Nicholls Executive Member 3/09/2017
Ricky Waters Executive member 3/09/2017
Mary Margaret Hepburn Secretary/Treasurer 17/01/2017
Carol Lorraine Grant Executive member 29/08/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/10/2023 NOC022
15/09/2021 NOC019
8/10/2019 NOC016
12/08/2018 NOC014
27/05/2017 NOC011
2/03/2016 NOC009
27/01/2016 NOC008
18/12/2015 NOC007
25/02/2015 NOC006
17/03/2014 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.