Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand
CC24498
9429042778035
Registered

Registration details

18/05/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Leukaemia And Blood Foundation Of New Zealand 19/05/2008
Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand 1/01/2012

Address for service

PO Box 99182
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
6 Claude Road
Epsom
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

(09)6383556
(09)6383557
www.facebook.com/LBCNZ
www.twitter.com/LBCNZ
www.youtube.com/LBFNZ and www.instagram.com/LBCNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

With a vision to cure and a mission to care for patients and families affected by blood cancers and related blood conditions Leukaemia & Blood Cancer New Zealand (LBC) is a national organisation providing patient support programmes, research funding, advocacy, awareness and information.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(We support patients and families affected by blood cancers and related blood conditions at all ages and ethnic groups)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Leukaemia & Blood Cancer Endowment Fund CC50277

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 20/08/2024 $6,455,763 $5,297,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 14/09/2023 $7,467,224 $7,549,635 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 25/08/2022 $8,606,863 $7,966,209 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 26/08/2021 $8,650,758 $7,432,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 26/08/2020 $7,441,060 $7,002,861 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 22/08/2019 $7,565,558 $7,237,734 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 3/09/2018 $6,480,321 $6,142,965 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/08/2017 $7,911,096 $6,232,103 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 11/09/2016 $6,532,876 $5,651,357 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David William Downs Trustee 20/11/2024
Rodger Edwin Tiedemann Trustee 20/11/2024
Tim Edwin Edmonds CEO 30/01/2024
Naomi Anne McRae Trustee 17/08/2022
Matthew James Roberts Trustee 1/04/2021
Faye Holahan Head of Marketing and Fundraising 29/03/2021
Mark Kevin Radburnd Trustee 21/08/2019
Edwin Thomas Fletcher Trustee 20/02/2019
Emma Bronwyn Barker Head of Support Services and Operations 14/03/2016
Andrew McKenzie Trustee 15/10/2014
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fale Andrew Lesa Trustee 18/09/2024
Shai Virendra Patel Trustee 18/09/2024
Peter Fergusson CEO 9/02/2024
Tony Wilding Trustee 17/08/2022
Arthur Loo Trustee 31/03/2021
Hilary Blacklock Trustee 31/03/2021
Glenn Victor Williams Trustee 17/04/2019
Blair Wingfield Trustee 29/08/2018
Pru Etcheverry Chief Executive Officer 6/04/2018
Rachel Lerner Trustee 21/10/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/11/2024 NOC034
24/09/2024 NOC033
5/02/2024 NOC031
15/02/2023 NOC029
25/08/2022 NOC028
28/07/2021 NOC025
22/06/2021 NOC024
26/04/2019 NOC021
25/02/2019 NOC020
7/09/2018 NOC019
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.