Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Titirangi Baptist Church
TBC
CC24640
9429051745387
Registered

Registration details

20/05/2008
December 31

Address for service

44 Kaurilands Road
Titirangi
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

09 8177930
https://www.facebook.com/search/top/?q=titirangi%20baptist%20church&epa=SEARCH_BOX


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We are a New Zealand church who exists to further the Kingdom of God within our own congregation, within our local community and also around the world; to bring glory to God by gathering regularly to share life, learn, worship and encourage one another; to serve those in our local community by meeting practical needs, bringing understanding and peace, seeking justice for those on the margins and offering spiritual healing through the Christian gospel. Our vision is expressed as "Called in Christ: to community, to the world, to God's glory".

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The church is an autonomous body governed through its members and affiliated with the Baptist Union of New Zealand. The leadership of the church consists of those elected to eldership and pastoral roles. Together they are responsible to the members of TBC for the oversight and direction of this church.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/06/2023 $859,391 $740,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2022 $1,445,375 $719,687 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 21/06/2021 $905,522 $595,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 28/07/2020 $1,109,846 $553,430 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 19/06/2019 $778,337 $532,079 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/01/2019 $1,090,621 $558,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 14/06/2017 $992,872 $548,033 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 25/05/2016 $450,486 $399,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 27/05/2015 $441,651 $382,517 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jill Jacomb Elder 26/11/2023
Robert Heeringa Elder 26/11/2023
Ross Taylor Elder 26/11/2023
Janine May Schache Elder 25/09/2022
Jonathan Edward Smith Elder 25/09/2022
Matthew Sharpe Senior Pastor 1/01/2022
Ruth Tate Elder 20/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Quayle Elder 26/11/2023
Andy Shudall Senior Pastor 3/09/2023
Daniel Andrew Mangalaraj Elder 20/04/2023
Robert Ayres Elder 21/12/2022
Lynda Slaney Elder 29/10/2022
Charles Erlam Elder 30/09/2021
Jan Harding Elder 30/09/2021
Murray Harding Elder 15/08/2021
Larne Edmeades Elder 29/10/2019
Alana Ramsay Elder 31/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/02/2024 NOC036
16/11/2023 NOC035
29/06/2023 NOC033
10/10/2022 NOC031
10/03/2022 NOC028
19/08/2021 NOC027
25/06/2021 NOC026
20/10/2020 NOC024
28/05/2019 NOC021
21/09/2018 NOC019
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.