pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Christian Church Community Trust
CC25088
9429042871354
Registered

Registration details

29/05/2008
July 31

Address for service

Private Bag 611
Greymouth
7840
28 Heaphy Road
RD 1
Haupiri
Dobson
7872

Charity's other details

03 738 0519
03 738 0212


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide for the continuing existence and development of the Christian Church Communities according to every commandment and principle of the New Testament and according to the declaration of faith “What We Believe”. As a means of furthering the above object, to provide the necessary means and facilities whereby the members of the Christian Church Communities, together with any other persons who wish to become members, may live together in their family units as Christian Church Communities, supporting themselves by their own labours, meeting one another’s needs equally, and having all things common. To provide for the general and Christian education of all the children (and adults) of the Christian Church Communities in both secular and spiritual matters according to all the commandments and principles of the New Testament and the declaration of Faith, “What We Believe” To provide for the preaching of the Gospel, for the education of the public, and other charitable acts.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Christian Church Community Trust is a registered Charitable Trust that operates a religious community, based in Haupiri. The Trust owns the communal living facilities in which the community members reside. The Trust operates a private school and three early childcare centres and owns 100% shares in 8 companies.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Air West Coast Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Apetiza Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Canaan Farming Dairy Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Canaan Farming Deer Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Canaan Farming Engineering Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Caring Midwives Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Gloriavale Christian Preschools (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Gloriavale Christian School (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Haupiri Net Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Value Protiens Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 January 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 January 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
25/02/2022 25/02/2022 $19,890,000 $17,597,000
28/02/2021 26/02/2021 $21,298,000 $18,515,000
29/02/2020 20/03/2020 $21,854,000 $21,074,000
31/01/2019 31/01/2019 $20,016,000 $20,901,000
31/01/2018 31/01/2018 $19,352,000 $18,120,000
31/01/2017 21/07/2017 $16,541,630 $16,813,736
31/01/2016 31/01/2016 $6,080,756 $4,355,134
31/01/2015 4/02/2015 $5,050,225 $3,185,671
31/01/2014 31/01/2014 $5,993,210 $4,258,808

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Stedfast Trustee 25/05/2021
Luke Valor Trustee 25/05/2021
Joshua Disciple Trustee 5/12/2019
Colin Neil Smith Independent Trustee 16/07/2018
David Gordon McMillan Independent Trustee 16/07/2018
David Maurice Smith Independent Trustee 16/07/2018
Samuel Valor Chariman 6/11/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Enoch Upright Trustee 25/05/2021
Fervent Stedfast Trustee 25/05/2021
Zion Pilgrim Trustee 16/09/2020
Mark Christian Trustee 5/12/2019
Howard Temple Chairman 3/10/2019
Steady Standtrue Trustee 25/11/2014
Hopeful Christian Overseeing Shepherd 12/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/01/2022 NOC025
27/05/2021 NOC024
27/02/2021 NOC023
9/11/2020 NOC021
22/09/2020 NOC020
25/01/2020 NOC018
22/11/2019 NOC017
8/10/2019 NOC016
17/09/2019 NOC015
12/07/2018 NOC013

Charity Documents