pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Guardians of the Bay of Islands Incorporated
Nga Kaiawhi o Nga Kaitiaki o Ipipiri / Project Island Song
CC25193
9429043052875
Registered

Registration details

2/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 142
Russell
0242
34B Davis Crescent
Paihia 0200
Paihia
0200

Charity's other details

021 407 029


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, support and encourage the conservation, protection and enhancement of native biodiversity of the Bay of Islands.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Undertakes restoration work - pest control, weed busting, tree planting, species re-introductions and education.)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are an incorporated society, with a committee of twelve. The entity's activities are funded by donations & grants from both government departments & various philanthropic organisations, and relies heavily on volunteers for a large proportion of it's activities and on donated goods and services.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 14/01/2021 $192,842 $173,592
31/12/2019 29/12/2019 $234,984 $234,788
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $170,649 $176,803
31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $186,984 $177,161
31/12/2016 30/11/2016 $233,350 $231,807
31/12/2015 5/12/2015 $205,059 $203,097
31/12/2014 24/12/2014 $123,964 $122,675
31/12/2013 20/12/2013 $89,559 $79,590
31/12/2012 21/12/2012 $52,052 $44,649

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mary Jaqueline Moore Treasurer 1/11/2020
Rachael Biggins Committee member 3/11/2019
William Robert Fuller Committee member 2/11/2017
Michell Elboz Committee member 12/10/2016
Sarah Knight Secretary 12/10/2016
Arana Rewha Committee Member 9/06/2015
Andrea Margaret Sim Committee Member 20/10/2013
Thomas Reginald Lindesay Committee Member 13/10/2009
Fleur Barbara Corbett Chairperson 25/01/2007
Richard Moses Witehira Committee Member 4/05/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jill Toplis Committee 12/08/2019
Bev Sharpe Treasurer 30/12/2018
Debby Potts Committee 20/11/2018
John Martin Committe 2/11/2017
Theresa Vujcich Committee 20/03/2017
Terri Dent Committee 25/11/2016
Helen Ough-Dealy Committee Member 25/09/2014
Helen Marguerite Shaft Committee Member 25/09/2014
Adriana Rogowski Committee Member 20/10/2013
Darryl Honey committee member 20/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/07/2021 NOC019
29/05/2021 NOC018
29/05/2021 NOC017
4/11/2020 NOC015
9/11/2019 NOC013
12/05/2017 NOC010
28/01/2015 NOC008
20/12/2013 NOC007
26/03/2013 NOC003
21/12/2012 AR005

Charity Documents