Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Palmerston North Central Baptist Church
CC25217
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

190 Church Street
West End
Palmerston North
4412

Charity's other details

06 357 3659
com/pncbc


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Helping people become lifelong followers of Jesus Christ. To engage in the task of mission, within New Zealand and overseas. To express God's love to the community, both in the Church and outside it. To meet regularly for worship, prayer, teaching, encouragement and fellowship.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

An autonomous body governed through its members, working closely with the Baptist Churches of NZ and the wider church.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 8/11/2024 7/11/2024 $836,668 $777,477 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/09/2023 8/10/2023 $785,918 $716,555 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/09/2022 3/10/2022 $796,181 $749,290 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 9/06/2021 $775,974 $739,105 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 2/09/2020 $876,377 $850,661 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 17/09/2019 $881,641 $825,544 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 2/07/2018 $874,776 $782,722 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/10/2017 $815,301 $584,870 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 20/06/2016 $595,635 $575,521 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brent Norrish Elder 1/11/2023
Margaret Bates Finance Committee Member 1/11/2023
Mike Jinpeng Lai Treasurer 1/11/2023
Sandra Aitken Finance Committee Member 1/11/2023
Bryony Large Administrator 1/09/2023
Gemma Stewart Elder 20/11/2022
Jonathan Higgs Elder 22/11/2020
Lily Norrish Elder 22/11/2020
Nicolaas Portegys Elder 22/11/2020
Ronan Chen Elder 22/11/2020
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melody Chang Elder 30/11/2023
Aimee Gray Treasurer 19/11/2023
Richard Woodmass Elder 12/12/2022
Brendon Chapple Elder 20/11/2022
David Herron Elder 20/11/2022
Daniel Xiashong Lai Elder 22/11/2020
Josie Te Kahu Elder 22/11/2020
Lisa Emerson Elder 22/11/2020
Lyndon John Smith Treasurer 22/11/2020
Peter Neil Blyde Elder 22/11/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/02/2024 NOC021
6/12/2023 NOC019
27/11/2023 NOC018
20/06/2016 NOC010
1/07/2015 NOC009
31/03/2015 NOC008
20/06/2013 NOC005
20/06/2011 NOC004
19/05/2011 NOC003
11/06/2010 AR003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.