Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Medic Alert Foundation - New Zealand Incorporated
Medic Alert, MedicAlert, Medic - Alert
CC25227
9429042793359
Registered

Registration details

6/2/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 40028
Upper Hutt
5140
Unit 1
5 Gibbons Street
Upper Hutt
5018

Charity's other details

(04)5288218
(04)5279540
https://www.facebook.com/MedicAlertFoundationNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable objects for which the Society is established are: (Abbrev. due to avail space) (a) To provide indicia to persons.. (b) To educate the wider public that.. (c) To educate the wider public, including workplace personnel, that .. (d) To encourage Healthcare Providers, Health Practitioners, members of law enforcement agencies and others, when administering first aid... (e) To acquire, store, disclose and maintain personal and health information of members... (f) Create, develop, install, and use Software to provide reasonably priced Information Technology Services... (g) To provide other reasonably priced products, services, and resources for people with Medical Problems, including their family and/or support people and promote changes in behaviour that may improve their health and quality of life. (h) To do all such things as are incidental or conducive to the attainment of the above charitable objects including, without limitation, making grants.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Supply of identification and health Information to Prevent Harm and Protect Lives, in emergencies. Educate for public awareness, use of charitable services and prevention or harm.)

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities, Emergency Medical Information

Other (please state)

(People with hidden and potentially life threatening medical risks), Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Medic Alert Foundation is a New Zealand Registered Non-Profit Incorporated Society. It is a New Zealand Registered Charity, Registration # CC25227 and a Health Information Agency listed on Schedule 2 of the Health Information Privacy Code. The Foundation operates exclusively for Charitable Purposes, including provision of Charitable Supplies at reasonable charitable rates. The Foundation provides an Emergency Health IT Portal in accordance with SOC2 and ISO 27001 International Standards.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
6/30/2023 12/31/2023 12/21/2023 $2,461,201 $2,337,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2022 12/31/2022 11/23/2022 $2,435,661 $2,503,833 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2021 12/31/2021 12/14/2021 $2,870,410 $2,540,334 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2020 12/31/2020 11/5/2020 $3,150,472 $2,947,798 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2019 12/31/2019 11/6/2019 $2,346,311 $2,261,727 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2018 3/31/2019 4/10/2019 $1,837,432 $1,833,232 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2017 12/31/2017 11/8/2017 $1,915,467 $1,922,336 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2016 12/31/2016 11/24/2016 $2,042,745 $2,057,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2015 12/31/2015 12/3/2015 $1,746,923 $1,634,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2014 12/31/2014 5/5/2015 $1,538,949 $1,603,156 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Olivia May Lotz Operations Services Manager 2/8/2023
Roderick David Mulgan Director 11/9/2022
Desley Ann Hutton Finance Manager/ Board Secretary 10/20/2021
Carolyn Weston Director 10/13/2021
Kevin Brady Director 10/13/2021
Katy Wilkinson Deputy Chair 11/6/2019
Lallit Rajpal Director 11/6/2019
Dr Andrew Dunn Medical Director 11/7/2012
Jenny Kendall Director 11/7/2012
Wayne Guppy Board Chair 11/10/2010
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Daniel Bruce Kevin Lord IT Manager 2/2/2023
Richard Cooper Operations Manager 1/20/2023
Michael Robin Bott Director 11/9/2022
Ashley Leabourn Board Secretary 2/20/2022
Graham Sharpe Director 4/12/2021
Pieri Munro Board Chair 4/12/2021
Andrew Bos Director 11/6/2019
Kate Wang Director 11/6/2019
Barbara Cheevers Finance Manager 11/30/2018
Raymond John William Brookie Director 11/7/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/16/2023 NOC033
2/9/2023 NOC032
11/23/2022 NOC030
3/1/2022 NOC029
12/17/2021 NOC028
12/17/2021 NOC027
10/26/2021 NOC025
4/15/2021 NOC024
4/14/2021 NOC023
11/6/2020 NOC021
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.