Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland District Kidney Society Incorporated
Auckland Kidney Society; Kidney Society; ADKS
CC25245
9429042586500
Registered

Registration details

3/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 97026
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
5 Swaffield Road
Papatoetoe
Auckland
2025

Charity's other details

(09)2781321


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the welfare of people with kidney failure and their families by providing on-going support and by monitoring and influencing renal services. Currently, to provide free lifelong personal support services for all people with kidney failure and their families in the Northland, Auckland, Waikato, Bay of Plenty, Lakes, Tairawhiti and Hawke's Bay regions and to work with public health services and health professionals, representing and promoting the interests of kidney patients and their families.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Public Health Service

Entity Structure

Governance: The Society is incorporated as a Board under the provision of the Charitable Trusts Act, 1975. The Society has an Executive Board consisting of no less than five and no more than nine Board Members, who must all be current financial members of the Society. The Board currently has 7 members who are generally renal patients, or parents, or partners of renal patients. Operational structure: eight paid staff, two contracted staff and a small number of casual/ volunteer staff.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auckland District Kidney Society (Community Facilities) Limited CC57166
Auckland District Kidney Society (Renal Services Kotahitanga) Limited CC57938

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/08 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/09.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 29/11/2023 $910,092 $942,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 1/12/2022 $762,866 $794,293 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 16/12/2021 $898,266 $791,868 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $918,358 $801,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $862,715 $804,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 3/12/2018 $755,971 $932,095 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/01/2018 7/02/2018 $817,825 $884,887 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 27/01/2017 $731,275 $767,178 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/12/2015 $1,028,604 $764,099 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 28/12/2014 $804,639 $690,458 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chantelle Good Board member 7/02/2023
Jatin Patel Board member 7/02/2023
Donna Tercel Board member 27/11/2018
David Graeme Wingate Board member 7/06/2017
John Brian Kearns Board member 12/07/2016
Anthony Miller Board Chair 25/06/2013
Gail Valmai Thomson Treasurer 28/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kirstin Blackburn Board member 18/10/2023
Janice Lorraine Dyson Secretary 1/01/2022
Nora Van der Schrieck Board member 24/08/2021
Brett Butterworth Chair 6/07/2021
Eileen Gock Board Member 21/01/2019
Vivienne Walker Committee Member 12/07/2016
Paul Clark Committee Member 20/10/2015
Milton Purchase Chairman 25/11/2014
Tim Toehemotu Trustee 25/02/2014
Paula Caroline Daye Trustee 26/11/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/11/2023 NOC033
6/11/2023 NOC032
2/11/2023 NOC031
22/05/2023 NOC030
31/08/2021 NOC027
3/08/2021 NOC026
22/12/2020 NOC023
22/01/2019 NOC021
20/12/2018 NOC020
4/12/2018 NOC019
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.