pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Teachers' Refresher Course Committee (Incorporated)
CC25646
9429042918028
Registered

Registration details

10/06/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Teachers Refresher Course Committee (Incorporated) 11/06/2008
The Teachers' Refresher Course Committee (Incorporated) 2/08/2018

Address for service

PO Box 1058
Wellington
6140
Bayley's Building
Level 9, Suite 3, 36 Brandon Street
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 477 6148
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/TRCCNewZealand/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Teachers' Refresher Course Committee Incorporated (TRCC) provides inspirational and unique professional development for professional learning communities within and across the education sectors. We empower teachers to reflect on and improve their teaching practice in order enhance learning. The TRCC exists to: - Improve the quality of teaching and learning in New Zealand education. - Provide quality professional development for all New Zealand educators. - Deliver national courses 'for teachers by teachers'. - Take account of research, model best practice in education, in course planning.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(professional development for teachers)

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Teachers and Teaching Community)

Entity Structure

Based in Wellington the TRCC members are nominated by the teacher unions: Governance Committee and PLD Committee. The Governance Committee are the TRCC officers. - 2 representatives (NZEI) - 2 secondary representatives (PPTA) - 2 tertiary representatives (TEU) - 1 independent member, endorsed by the three unions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $678,232 $587,061
31/12/2019 12/12/2019 $929,124 $681,920
31/12/2018 9/12/2018 $687,798 $725,168
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $794,084 $824,248
31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $743,283 $700,556
31/12/2015 7/12/2015 $700,684 $611,372
31/12/2014 11/12/2014 $828,838 $821,360
31/12/2013 12/12/2013 $803,348 $889,378
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $721,066 $711,347

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Danielle Sanders member 12/02/2020
Mark Potter NZEI representative 17/10/2019
Rochelle Roddick Treasurer 6/12/2018
Jack Boyle PPTA Representative 19/07/2018
Joanne Young NZEI representative 19/07/2018
Anthony Neyland Chairperson 5/04/2018
Serena Lewis Deputy Chair 13/12/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Louise Green Governance Committee member 1/01/2020
Kathryn Levy Chairperson 5/12/2019
Catha Ritchie PLD Committee member 28/06/2018
Catherine Ryan PLD committee member 28/06/2018
Chris Oaks PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018
Danielle Sanders PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018
Diane Lawrence Treasurer and PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018
Karina Bird PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018
Kirsty Farrant PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018
Monica Mercury PLD Committee Member 28/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/12/2020 NOC017
27/07/2020 NOC016
7/02/2019 NOC013
2/08/2018 NOC011
25/07/2017 NOC009
8/12/2015 NOC007
11/12/2014 NOC006
12/12/2013 NOC005
18/12/2012 AR005
8/12/2011 AR004

Charity Documents