Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

English Language Partners Taupo Inc
CC25905
9429042858041
Deregistered
04/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.

Below are details of English Language Partners Taupo Inc at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/06/2008
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 4/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 15/06/2008

Name change history

Name Effective Date
ESOL Home Tutors (Taupo) Incorporated 16/06/2008
English Language Partners Taupo Inc 20/07/2009

Address for service

PO Box 1208
Taupo
3351
30 Heuheu Street
Taupo
3330

Charity's other details

(07)3788853
(07)3784249


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Teaches english (services)

Education / training / research

Social services, Promotion of volunteering, Settlement Support

Migrants / refugees


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chintu Contractor Committee member 12/05/2014
John Boddy Committee member 12/05/2014
Rotchana Pogoni Committee member 27/03/2012
Gill Cook Committee Member 30/03/2009
Doreen Blyth Committee Member 28/03/2007
Patisepa Tagata Committee Member 15/03/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lorraine Stieglbauer Committee Member 5/05/2014
Mark Burton Committee Member 30/09/2013
Mary Monzingo Treasurer 3/04/2013
Chanka Arachchige Panambalene Perera committee member 1/10/2012
Boyke Bratakusuma Committee member 27/03/2012
Elizabeth Maria Mooij-telkamp Committee member 18/03/2011
Joan Anne Benson Committee member 18/03/2011
Lakshmia Somasundaram Committee member 18/03/2011
Suleiman Mander Committee member 18/03/2011
Andrew Williams Committee Member 19/03/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/05/2014 NOC013
21/05/2014 NOC012
14/11/2013 NOC011
11/04/2013 NOC010
16/10/2012 NOC009
10/04/2012 NOC008
12/04/2010 NOC007
8/04/2010 NOC006
8/07/2009 NOC005
24/06/2009 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.