Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

English Language Partners Waikato Incorporated
CC25908
9429042883395
Deregistered
04/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.

Below are details of English Language Partners Waikato Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/06/2008
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 4/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 15/06/2008

Name change history

Name Effective Date
ESOL Home Tutors (Waikato) (Incorporated) 16/06/2008
English Language Partners Waikato Incorporated 21/03/2009

Address for service

PO Box 4340
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3247
Boundary Road
Claudelands
Hamilton

Charity's other details

(07)8532188


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Community development, Settlement support

Migrants / refugees


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fred Weale Committee member 21/08/2013
Hisae Shiwa Committee member 21/08/2013
Murray Rickerby Committee member 28/04/2012
Wendy Li Committee member 28/04/2012
Margaret Peapell Chair of the centre 13/03/2010
Daniela Gaetana Sasso Committee member 21/03/2009
Heri Van Wering Committee member 16/07/2007
Mika Kobayashi Committee Member 16/07/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Clara Chan Committee Member 19/08/2013
Hyewon Lee Committee member 19/08/2013
Stuart Thomson Committee member 19/08/2013
Kes Stuart Committee member 28/04/2012
Peter Elliott Committee member 28/04/2012
Raewyn Putt Committee Member 28/04/2012
Rosemary Whittle Committee member 28/04/2012
Jennifer Magee Committee Member 30/03/2010
John Adams Treasurer 30/03/2010
Joan Duthie Committee Member 21/03/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/11/2013 NOC008
1/10/2012 NOC007
12/07/2012 NOC006
8/07/2009 NOC005
16/06/2009 NOC004
16/01/2009 NOC003
11/09/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.