Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Radio Heritage Foundation
CC25951
9429043102822
Deregistered
27/02/2020
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Radio Heritage Foundation at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 27/02/2020 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 15/06/2008

Address for service

109 Buckley Road
Southgate
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

(04) 934 4280

Oceania

Australia

North America

United States

Asia

Singapore

Europe

France


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

radio heritage preservation and eduction services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(provides heritage archiving, storytelling and museum services )

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, International activities, Economic development, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

registered charitable trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 18/08/2015 $18,764 $19,174 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 20/08/2014 $14,528 $14,118 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/03/2013 30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $17,985 $18,794 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2012 30/09/2012 16/07/2012 $5,947 $11,838 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 30/09/2011 $7,921 $5,537 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 17/09/2010 $9 $8 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2009 30/09/2009 11/09/2009 $9 $7 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
tourism advisory services (New Zealand) Limited trustee 2/10/2017
David Ricquish Trustee 8/01/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Adrian Peterson Trustee 1/04/2016
Jo Del Monaco Trustee 1/04/2016
Jonathan Marks Trustee 1/04/2016
Martin Hadlow Trustee 1/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/01/2019 NOC008
5/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.