pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Psychodrama Aotearoa New Zealand
PANZ
CC25992
9429042614814
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Christchurch Institute For Training In Psychodrama Trust 17/06/2008
Psychodrama Aotearoa New Zealand 31/10/2022

Address for service

PO Box 22376
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
335 Owhiwa Road
RD 1
Parua Bay
Onerahi
0192

Charity's other details

+64272767612


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

PANZ offers training in psychodrama through year-long programmes, training and experiential workshops, reading, writing, peer practice group, social activities and supervision. Most courses are open to those who wish to develop their professional abilities without necessarily becoming certificated practitioners.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Health, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

PANZ is a Charitable Trust with campuses in Auckland, Wellington, Nelson, Christchurch and Dunedin

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 13/04/2022 $30,030 $30,556
30/06/2021 11/06/2021 $40,914 $32,162
30/06/2020 10/06/2020 $56,307 $52,983
30/06/2019 23/05/2019 $49,501 $57,717
31/07/2018 30/07/2018 $73,825 $78,062
30/06/2017 6/11/2017 $56,442 $64,211
30/06/2016 23/06/2016 $55,926 $56,872
30/06/2015 27/08/2015 $58,778 $62,194
30/06/2014 9/06/2014 $61,674 $57,250

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Beverley Anne Hosking Trustee 14/10/2022
Cheryl Robyn Williscroft Trustee 14/10/2022
Christine Hosking Trustee 14/10/2022
Claire Patricia Guy Trustee 14/10/2022
Diana Jones Chair 14/10/2022
Sara Maud Crane Trustee 14/10/2022
Vivienne Beth Thomson Trustee 14/10/2022
Walter Logeman Secretary-Treasurer 14/10/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alison Begg Chair 14/10/2022
Carolyn Murray Trustee 14/10/2022
Cheryl Robyn Williscroft Trustee 14/10/2022
Jocelon Mary Phiskie Trustee 14/10/2022
Simon Neville Gurnsey Treasurer Secretary 14/10/2022
Grant Walker Trustee - Chair 1/10/2021
Gwen Reekie Board Member 27/09/2013
Annette Currie Board Member 28/09/2012
Charlotte Daellenbach Board Member 9/04/2010
Robert Crawford Chairperson 6/04/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/12/2022 NOC024
7/12/2022 NOC023
28/11/2022 NOC022
3/11/2022 NOC020
3/11/2022 NOC019
3/11/2022 NOC018
3/11/2022 NOC017
13/02/2022 NOC015
31/10/2018 NOC011
26/10/2018 NOC010

Charity Documents