Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Institute for World Evangelisation - ICPE Mission (New Zealand Branch)
ICPE Mission
CC26004
9429042664345
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

C/o Catholic Archdiocese of Wellington
PO Box 1937
Wellington
6140
C/o Catholic Archdiocese of Wellington
Level 2, 204 Thorndon Quay
Pipitea
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/ICPEMissionNZ

Oceania

Australia

Africa

Ghana

North America

United States

Asia

India, Korea, South, Malaysia, Philippines, Singapore

Europe

Germany, Italy, Malta, Poland, Vatican City


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Institute for World Evangelisation - ICPE Mission is a Catholic Mission made up of Christians committed to the goal of world evangelisation. The ICPE Mission is dedicated to the formation and training of Catholics so that they may become more effective evangelisers. Through evangelisation, discipleship, community building and mercy work, the ICPE Mission pursues its purpose of training, formation, serving the Church and affecting the world for Christ. The ICPE Mission is an International Association of Christ's faithful with Pontifical Right and is the missionary expression of the Glory of God International Covenant Community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Prisoners

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 29/06/2024 $1,619,654 $76,243 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 3/04/2023 $114,632 $128,320 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 10/05/2022 $80,585 $130,585 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/03/2021 $86,155 $118,334 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 17/04/2020 $181,301 $183,399 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 11/05/2019 $222,592 $174,721 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/08/2018 25/08/2018 $199,449 $209,807 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 2/03/2018 $319,411 $237,424 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 26/04/2017 $364,325 $286,694 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wimpie Santoso Trustee 22/07/2010
Charles Hannaford Trustee 1/02/1997
Fritz Mascarenhas Trustee 1/02/1997
Mark Dol Trustee 1/02/1997
Rainer Hensel Trustee 1/02/1997
Silvana Abela Trustee 1/02/1997
Anna Cappello Trustee 1/08/1990
Mario Cappello Trustee 1/08/1990

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Richard Luxford Trustee 31/12/2009
Edgard Nikolaus Wirtz Trustee 6/11/2008
Joachim Swienter Trustee 6/11/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/05/2023 NOC016
18/05/2023 NOC015
26/04/2017 NOC006
10/06/2013 AR006
30/06/2011 AR004
30/06/2010 AR003
12/06/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.