pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Adidam Trust (New Zealand)
CC26094
9429042868651
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

12 Seibel Road
Henderson Valley
Auckland
0614

Charity's other details

(09) 838 9114
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/AdidamNZ/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The specific and primary purposes are to practice and promote the practice of the religious faith of Adidam in New Zealand. (From the Constitution and Rules of the Trust) In addition The Trust promotes the Wisdom Teaching of Adi Da Samraj, in such areas as, for example: child rearing, death and dying, intimate relationships, diet. cooperative living, peace studies.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Members of Adidam

Entity Structure

There is a board of trustees elected at the Trust AGM. They oversee a Management Committee who are responsible for the day to day running of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 30/08/2023 $160,262 $87,603
30/09/2022 22/09/2022 $145,567 $65,450
30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $98,418 $78,420
31/10/2020 23/10/2020 $127,645 $123,291
31/10/2019 30/10/2019 $246,147 $241,082
30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $213,559 $198,795
30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $76,052 $52,964
30/09/2016 4/11/2016 $75,137 $67,737
30/09/2015 5/10/2015 $169,901 $153,654
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $168,630 $159,283

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kyle Randell Kenneth Truscott deputy chair 1/11/2022
Elliott Harold Brooks CFO 1/04/2022
Patrisha Helen OSullivan Secretary 1/11/2021
Nigel Graeme Webster Treasurer 15/09/2019
John Metcalfe Chair 8/12/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Colleen Margaret Phelps Chair 1/01/2023
Tracy Elizabeth Abbot Secretary 31/08/2021
Enda Francis Mcbride Trustee 15/09/2019
Christopher Dickey Treasurer 1/06/2019
David Malcolm Brock Trustee 2/03/2018
Dean Nugent Deputy Chairman 2/03/2018
Bernadine Coventry Trustee 16/08/2017
Eunice Madden Trustee 28/09/2016
Renai Irene Lindley Trustee 28/09/2016
Robert Mignault Secretary 28/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2023 NOC025
28/02/2023 NOC024
9/02/2022 NOC022
20/10/2019 NOC018
16/10/2019 NOC017
27/01/2019 NOC016
12/01/2019 NOC015
23/12/2018 NOC013
12/10/2018 NOC011
20/08/2017 NOC008

Charity Documents