Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Open Home Foundation Of New Zealand
Open Home Foundation
CC26102
9429042867579
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 31036
Lower Hutt
5040
Level 1 46-50 Railway Avenue
Lower Hutt
5040

Charity's other details

04 586 1077


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be a Christian community response to the needs of children and families in New Zealand by providing social work support and home based and specialised care services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

OHF is a Chief Executive led organisation with 13 local Service Centres and a National Office providing centralised practice leadership and corporate services support. Operational oversight is provided to Service Centres by 3 regional operations managers and practice advice by a team of regional practice managers

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 11/12/2024 $24,110,954 $23,360,261 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/01/2024 31/01/2024 $22,842,486 $21,519,958 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 29/11/2022 $22,860,913 $22,135,887 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 16/12/2021 $22,725,914 $21,338,352 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $21,477,469 $19,158,934 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 22/12/2019 $23,159,704 $22,293,222 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $19,885,119 $18,677,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 14/05/2018 $16,227,553 $15,897,384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/12/2016 $15,470,767 $15,182,879 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 27/01/2016 $15,621,672 $15,719,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Eaton Board Member 17/03/2022
Kylie Reenie Fletcher Board Member 31/01/2020
Kay Hyland Board Member 23/03/2017
John McIver Board Member 15/03/2006
Patricia Mcconnell Board Chairperson 13/08/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Duncan Board Chairperson 1/12/2022
Craig Braun Board Member 30/06/2021
Nicola Mayne Board Member 30/06/2020
Sarah Deighton Board Member 30/06/2020
Tom Ngapera Board Member 20/09/2018
Anthony Saxon Board Member 23/11/2017
Allan Geraghty Board Member 23/03/2017
Limoni Manu Board Member 23/03/2017
Colin Eason National Board Member 31/03/2016
Jill Robinson National Board Member 28/08/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/07/2023 NOC021
16/10/2018 NOC014
16/10/2018 NOC013
16/10/2018 NOC012
13/12/2017 NOC010
20/03/2017 NOC009
17/03/2017 NOC008
16/06/2015 NOC006
8/04/2013 AR005
21/03/2012 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.