Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Religious Society of Friends Aotearoa New Zealand Trust Board
CC26122
9429042740810
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

28 Grosvenor Street
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

096388662


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust Board, is the body legally established to hold in its name property of Yearly Meeting, its subsidiary Meetings, committees and trusts. The Board is responsible for the investment and administration of funds and makes decisions about grants for specific activities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Members of Society of Friends

Entity Structure

Trustees must be members of the Religious Society of Friends. They are appointed individually by Yearly Meeting for a term of three years and are eligible for a further three year period of service. There must be no fewer than six and no more than eight Trust Board members. The Board meets face-to-face at least once a year. Board meetings are open to any Friend with prior notification to the Secretary of the Board but decision-making is only by Board members.
The Religious Society Of Friends (Quakers) Yearly Meeting Of Aotearoa New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 22/03/2024 $48,724 $92,012 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/04/2023 $43,878 $67,984 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 9/05/2022 $101,837 $71,949 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 2/06/2021 $205,448 $90,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 26/02/2020 $159,737 $198,252 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 14/06/2019 $61,326 $373,879 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 24/06/2018 $622,718 $105,010 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 25/04/2017 $71,815 $200,204 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 12/05/2016 $91,617 $46,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 11/06/2015 $511,417 $35,923 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Christopher Fletcher Trustee 25/05/2023
Linley Clow Gregory Trustee 13/03/2023
Margaret Mary Norris Trustee 13/02/2023
Adrian Paul Skelton Trustee 21/08/2022
John Highton Trustee 1/01/2021
Robin Newman Watts Trustee, Treasurer 7/02/2020
Murray Rodwell Short Trustee, Clerk 1/10/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
William Vernon Robinson Trustee 31/08/2023
David Minifie Trustee 20/02/2023
Deborah Gimpelson Trustee 20/02/2023
Noel John Simpson Trustee 4/08/2021
Anne Shirley Wicks Trustee 31/12/2020
Noel Charles Bridgeman Trustee 30/06/2019
Alan Reynolds Trustee 31/12/2018
Rosemary Verity Clare Tredgold Board member 31/12/2018
Judith Claire Wishart Trustee 30/09/2018
David James Trustee 1/06/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/05/2023 NOC041
20/04/2023 NOC039
3/09/2022 NOC038
21/08/2022 NOC037
18/01/2022 NOC035
18/01/2022 NOC034
26/05/2021 NOC032
25/05/2021 NOC031
27/02/2020 NOC029
26/02/2020 NOC028
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.