Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


La Vida Trust
Life Church
CC26177
9429042795933
Registered

Registration details

18/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
North West New Life Trust 19/06/2008
La Vida Trust 27/07/2011

Address for service

PO Box 6473
Upper Riccarton
Christchurch
8442
34A Hansons Lane
Upper Riccarton
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details

03 3434935


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Knowing God, Loving People, Changing Lives

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Community development, Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 28/11/2024 $2,636,338 $2,494,027 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 25/10/2023 $2,334,369 $2,257,497 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $2,034,067 $2,038,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 16/02/2022 15/02/2022 $4,289,774 $1,676,524 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 24/12/2020 $1,638,434 $1,649,294 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/12/2019 4/12/2019 $1,993,347 $1,758,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $1,478,001 $1,479,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/09/2017 $1,818,948 $1,366,998 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $1,514,013 $1,234,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rebecca Joy Williams Trustee 1/03/2023
Samuel Robert Seatter Trustee 9/07/2020
Jeremy Brian Kench Trustee 6/11/2019
Carl Crocker Trustee 23/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sophie Marie Tremewan Trustee 28/08/2024
Marcia Kaye Bennetts Trustee 1/03/2023
Paul Justin Cargill Trustee / Chairman 1/03/2023
Christopher James Hannen Trustee 6/11/2019
Clifford Paul Bennetts Trustee 6/11/2019
John Brent Schroeder Trustee 6/11/2019
Karen Joyce McKinnon Trustee - Secretary 6/11/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/09/2024 NOC020
23/03/2023 NOC018
23/03/2023 NOC017
22/07/2020 NOC013
5/12/2019 NOC011
22/09/2017 NOC009
5/12/2013 NOC006
17/12/2011 AR004
29/09/2011 NOC003
4/08/2011 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.