Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Royal New Zealand Plunket Society Timaru Branch Incorporated
CC26182
9429042730255
Deregistered
26/06/2016
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity is no longer carrying on its operations.

Below are details of Royal New Zealand Plunket Society Timaru Branch Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

18/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 26/06/2016 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity is no longer carrying on its operations.
Registered 18/06/2008

Address for service

62 Maude Street
Temuka
7920

Charity's other details

0272801969


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This Charity has been granted an exemption from filing a Notice of Change Form with their amended rules on 13th October 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing a notice of change form with their amended rules on 3 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/03/2016 $73,028 $69,236 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 21/11/2014 $110,031 $109,652 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 12/12/2013 $106,438 $131,106 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 11/01/2013 $116,182 $137,561 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 21/12/2011 $61,086 $61,295 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 5/01/2011 $46,327 $59,585 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 21/12/2009 $50,823 $81,136 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2008 31/12/2008 12/01/2009 $46,086 $38,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Smart Committee Member 12/11/2014
Sheree-Anne Louise Sadler Treasuer 12/11/2014
Rebecca Smith Secretary 1/01/2014
Gabby Walker Vice president 21/11/2011
Margaret Connell President 10/11/2010
Megan Joy Evans Secretary 10/11/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roger Stephenson Grigg Treasurer 12/11/2014
Maria Jane Clark Vice President 30/06/2011
Rebekah Mary Worner Secretary 10/11/2010
Tina Anne Grant President 10/11/2010
Nicola Mae Skelton Treasurer 22/04/2009
Julie Anne Brohan Secretary 11/11/2008
Nicola Anne Carpenter Vice President 11/11/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/12/2013 NOC007
11/01/2013 AR006
21/12/2011 AR005
5/01/2011 AR004
21/12/2009 AR003
13/04/2009 NOC002
12/01/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.