pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Council Of Victim Support Groups Incorporated
Victim Support
CC26219
9429041909850
Registered

Registration details

18/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 3017
Wellington
6140
180 Molesworth Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 474 8862


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Manaaki Tāngata Victim Support is here 24/7 for people directly affected by crime, suicide and traumatic events, including their whānau and witnesses. We support people at their time of crisis and through the justice system so that they feel informed, empowered, safe and able to cope with the impact. We provide tailored immediate and short-term emotional support, practical assistance, information, referrals to other agencies and support through the criminal justice system and coronial process.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Social services

General public

Entity Structure

Victim Support is an independent incorporated society domiciled in New Zealand and is a charitable organisation registered under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and the Charities Act 2005.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 6/12/2023 $19,666,812 $21,495,629
31/12/2022 15/12/2022 $16,401,565 $17,968,351
31/12/2021 17/11/2021 $17,459,178 $17,349,891
31/12/2020 10/12/2020 $17,205,890 $16,629,395
31/12/2019 13/12/2019 $28,341,327 $25,693,274
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $10,831,756 $10,639,214
31/12/2017 27/12/2017 $11,018,402 $10,886,058
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $11,419,482 $11,830,127
31/12/2015 13/12/2015 $11,113,073 $11,268,148
31/12/2014 25/02/2015 $11,403,477 $11,546,851

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Harley Thompson Maori Representative North Island 19/11/2023
Rosalind June Basset-Black Board Member 19/11/2023
Darren Rewi Maori Representative (South Island) 23/11/2022
Nicky Rawlings Board Member 15/10/2016
Robert Marshall Chairperson 31/10/2014
Gwen Neave Board Member 20/10/2013
Don Battah Board Member 27/10/2012
Michael John Dowling Board Member 29/10/2011
Richard Martin Smith Board Member 16/10/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Judith Ann Karaitiana Board Member 19/11/2023
Lorraine Susan Scanlon Board Member 19/11/2023
Aroha Gibb Board Member 20/11/2022
Panapa Stewart Davis Board Member 15/10/2016
Jennifer Jane Bryden Board Member 17/10/2015
Kim Maree Bredenbeck Board Member 7/11/2013
Bruce Bird Board Member 3/05/2013
Wendy Robilligra Board Member 31/07/2012
Douglas Napier Eckhoff Deputy Chairman 30/06/2012
Richard Edmund Morris Board Member 29/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/11/2023 NOC023
19/12/2022 NOC022
23/11/2022 NOC020
21/11/2018 NOC014
29/06/2018 NOC013
15/12/2015 NOC009
6/05/2013 NOC005
3/12/2012 NOC004
15/11/2012 AR005
15/11/2012 NOC003

Charity Documents