Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Royal New Zealand Plunket Society Invercargill Branch Incorporated
CC26333
9429042738633
Deregistered
24/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.

Below are details of Royal New Zealand Plunket Society Invercargill Branch Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

22/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 24/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity no longer requires charitable status.
Registered 22/06/2008

Address for service

132 Kelvin Street
Avenal
Invercargill
9810

Charity's other details

032395562


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Health services for children under 5 yrs

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Family / whanau, Family, Whanu and Children


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This Charity has been granted an exemption from filing a Notice of Change Form with their amended rules on 13th October 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing a notice of change form with their amended rules on 3 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 19/12/2013 $42,055 $68,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 1/02/2013 $68,802 $75,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 20/11/2011 $51,300 $66,436 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 11/12/2010 $100,636 $84,461 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 26/11/2009 $59,324 $75,213 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2008 31/12/2008 9/01/2009 $79,152 $68,262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Issabella Chaney Board Member 1/07/2012
Janeen Elizabeth Wild Board Member 1/07/2012
Nicki Jane White Area President 1/07/2012
Tania Lee Lawry Board Member 1/07/2012
Jane Milne President 10/11/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Erin Cringlington Committee Member 30/06/2012
G Donnelly Secretary 30/06/2012
Jillian Ann Easson Committee Member 30/06/2012
Kim Jane Forsyth President 30/06/2012
Lisa Stuart Committee Member 30/06/2012
Nicola Maree Marwick Committee Member 30/06/2012
Nicola Jane Mcara Treasurer 30/06/2012
Philippa Mary Blair Vice President 30/06/2012
Rachel Hoogeveen Secretary 30/06/2012
Sue Boucher Treasurer Otatara 30/06/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/02/2013 AR006
20/11/2011 AR005
11/12/2010 AR004
26/11/2009 AR003
9/01/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.