Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Methodist Church of New Zealand Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa Waimea Parish - Parish (7030)
CC26567
N/A
Deregistered
01/02/2015

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$22,533,880
$403

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of The Methodist Church of New Zealand Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa Waimea Parish - Parish (7030) at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

24/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 931
Christchurch
8140
25 Latimer Square
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 366 6049
03 364 9439


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Social services, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 15/09/2015 $65,092 $77,499 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 29/08/2014 $70,570 $75,529 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 9/11/2013 $64,077 $71,477 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 4/07/2012 $80,347 $79,136 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 4/10/2011 $69,574 $67,950 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 27/01/2011 $68,011 $61,516 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 9/11/2009 $94,000 $104,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Donald Allan Horne Treasurer 1/07/2011
Murray Marshall Parish Steward / Secretary 25/06/2008
Richard Shepard Parish Steward 25/06/2008
Graham Edwin Reburn Chairperson/ Parish Steward 1/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Geoffrey William Nock Treasurer 30/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/09/2011 NOC002
9/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.