Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hamlin Charitable Fistula Hospitals Trust
CC26896
9429043057429
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6395
Upper Riccarton
Christchurch
8442
286 Oxford Terrace
Riccarton
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

02041009412
www.facebook.com/hamlinnz

Africa

Ethiopia


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission and purpose, as set out in the Trust Deed are, 'to provide long-term financial support for the work and associated activities of the Addis Ababa Fistula Hospital in Ethiopia, in the treatment and care of patients suffering from Obstetric Fistula, and in the prevention of this condition' In particular, in recent years the Trust has supported the operating costs of rural midwifery clinics which prevent fistula through providing safe childbirth for rural women.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Trustees are appointed and meet in person or telephone link as required. The Management Committee, which includes trustees and other persons, makes operational decisions and organises the work of the Trust. The committee meets four or five timers per year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 10/07/2023 $154,852 $247,298 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/12/2022 $185,539 $298,100 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 13/01/2022 $417,959 $31,805 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $192,752 $291,842 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 11/02/2020 $177,794 $221,349 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 6/03/2020 $186,528 $134,288 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 8/02/2018 $236,775 $23,801 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 1/03/2017 $104,559 $115,450 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 July 2022 to 31 March 2023.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Belay Trustee 17/11/2022
Samuel Thomas Boyes Trustee 20/05/2021
Stephen James Wescombe Trustee 4/05/2019
Ronda Jolene Wescombe Trustee 8/03/2016
Marty van der Burg trustee 1/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kenneth John Lord Trustee 24/02/2023
Judith Ellen Bullin Trustee 24/01/2022
Errold Lyndsay Paynter Trustee 1/04/2021
Sonya Maree de Vries Trustee 7/11/2019
David Constable Close Trustee 28/02/2018
Anthony James Andrews Trustee 31/12/2017
Rosemary Janis Deane Trustee 30/11/2013
Deanne Felicity Hamlin Fielo Trustee 31/10/2012
Janet Celia Baskill Trustee 1/02/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/04/2024 NOC020
26/06/2023 NOC018
4/04/2023 NOC017
24/01/2022 NOC015
21/12/2021 NOC013
4/10/2020 NOC011
20/04/2018 NOC008
27/02/2014 NOC005
18/04/2013 AR005
11/04/2012 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.