Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Royal Forest & Bird Protection Society Of New Zealand Incorporated
Forest & Bird
CC26943
9429042800798
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Royal Forest And Bird Protection Society Of New Zealand Inc 30/06/2008
Royal Forest & Bird Protection Society Of New Zealand Incorporated 8/06/2023

Address for service

PO Box 631
Wellington
6140
205 Victoria Street
Cbd
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 3857374
04 3857373


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to preserve and protect the indigenous flora and fauna and natural features of Aotearoa New Zealand, including land and water habitats. Our strategic focus is to be the voice of nature in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Conservation advocacy and restoration)

Environment / conservation

Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Animals

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Forest & Bird Endowment Fund CC37277
James Sharon Watson Conservation Trust CC56604

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 18/06/2024 $16,668,401 $12,634,404 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $9,552,313 $9,633,083 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 28/06/2022 $11,611,982 $9,572,924 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/06/2021 $11,474,926 $8,769,204 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $9,517,998 $9,308,639 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 4/06/2019 $9,074,217 $8,581,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2018 31/08/2018 6/09/2018 $9,431,569 $8,639,823 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2017 31/08/2017 13/09/2017 $12,830,595 $8,340,612 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2016 31/08/2016 31/08/2016 $8,580,420 $7,655,651 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 10 months from 1 March 2018 to 31 December 2018.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rebecca Hatch Group Manager 8/10/2024
Eugenie Sage Board Member 22/06/2024
James Bruce Mackenzie Board Member 22/06/2024
Kate Littin Board member 22/06/2024
Romilly Cumming Board Member 22/06/2024
Erika Toleman General Counsel (acting) 27/05/2024
Duncan Toogood Group Manager 30/10/2023
Benjamin Paul Kepes Board member 24/06/2023
Bruce Dudley Clarkson Board Member 24/06/2023
Nigel William Thomson Treasurer 24/06/2023
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alan Chow National Treasurer 21/06/2024
Benjamin Paul Kepes Board Member 21/06/2024
Bruce Dudley Clarkson Board Member 21/06/2024
Kaya Freeman Board Member 21/06/2024
Vanessa MacDonald Board Member 21/06/2024
Ines Stager Board Member 23/06/2023
Richard Hursthouse Board member 23/06/2023
Monica Peters Board Member 19/06/2022
Te Atarangi Sayers Board Member 19/06/2022
Julie Watson GM Corporate Services 30/09/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/01/2025 NOC031
10/09/2024 NOC030
29/07/2024 NOC029
8/07/2024 NOC028
5/07/2024 NOC027
8/06/2023 NOC024
15/03/2023 NOC023
20/06/2022 NOC021
18/11/2021 NOC020
6/05/2021 NOC018
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.