Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch
Anglican Care (Canterbury-Westland)
CC27132
9429047812741
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 1032
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
276 Hereford Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03-5999-090


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Council, also known as Anglican Care (Canterbury/Westland), as set out in the rules of the Council, are to organise, promote, perform and evaluate all forms of Christian social service undertaken by the Agency within the Diocese. The mission of Anglican Care (Canterbury/Westland) is “in Christian love to serve and seek justice in the community”. The vision is that “In Christ, Anglican Care exists to enable every person within the Diocese region of Canterbury/Westland to have the opportunity to take a just, fulfilling and appropriate part in the community according to the resources reasonably available both internal and external.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch (also known as Anglican Care (Canterbury /Westland) is constituted and incorporated under the Social Service Council of the Diocese of Christchurch Act 1952. Anglican Care (Canterbury/Westland) services are provided by the operating divisions which include the Christchurch City Mission, Anglican Care South Canterbury, Elder Care and Anglican Advocacy.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 25/10/2023 $15,761,000 $11,422,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 2/11/2022 $15,984,000 $11,671,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 3/12/2021 $11,570,000 $9,635,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 14/12/2020 $9,778,000 $8,806,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $10,696,000 $10,110,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $8,312,000 $7,163,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $14,541,000 $13,859,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $14,620,000 $14,842,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/12/2015 $18,009,000 $13,613,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 30/10/2014 $15,739,000 $14,912,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cameron Cooper Moore Trust Board Member 4/07/2023
Christine Jane Johnston Trust Board Member 4/07/2023
Ross John McQueen Trust Board Member 4/07/2023
Suzanne Gay Peddie Trust Board Member 4/07/2023
Peter Ruane Carrell Trust Board Member 9/02/2019
Jane Ellen Evans Trust Board Member 6/10/2015
Neil Maurice Shewan Trust Board Member 2/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ben Martin Randall Trust Board Member 14/11/2023
Charles Edward Muir Trust Board Member 14/11/2023
Steffi Sue Brightwell TRUST BOARD MEMBER 14/11/2023
Steven Leonard Knight Trust Board Member 14/11/2023
Nalini Barbara Meyer Trust Board Member 1/03/2023
Peter John Beck Trust Board Member 3/09/2022
Lorraine Mokahetaue Ritchie Trust Board Member 2/08/2022
Katrina Mary Hill Trust Board Member 6/09/2019
John Sheldon Shoaf Trust Board Member 5/03/2019
Michael Paul Baker Trust Board Member 4/12/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2023 NOC046
22/08/2023 NOC044
1/08/2023 NOC043
17/03/2023 NOC042
21/12/2022 NOC041
9/09/2022 NOC039
12/08/2022 NOC038
7/11/2019 NOC034
21/10/2019 NOC033
3/05/2019 NOC032
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.