pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Environment Conservation And Outdoor Education Trust
ECOED / Save Our Kaweka Kiwi
CC27154
9429043106905
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

458 Apley Road
RD 4
Puketapu
Napier
4184

Charity's other details

027 432 5726
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/saveourkawekakiwi/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To restore and protect North Island Brown kiwi To provide educational talks and activities in particular relation to habitat restoration and kiwi conservation To promote outdoor education

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Kiwi Conservation and Environment Education)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Care / protection of animals, Outdoor Education

Children / young people

Animals, General public, Hawkes Bay Youth

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 23/11/2022 $47,397 $40,931
30/09/2021 28/08/2021 $49,617 $48,884
30/09/2020 30/06/2020 $87,165 $71,737
30/09/2019 6/09/2019 $41,936 $33,184
30/09/2018 5/11/2018 $39,934 $33,629
30/09/2017 5/11/2018 $35,520 $24,659
30/09/2016 3/08/2018 $52,405 $37,690
30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $48,324 $46,655
30/09/2014 17/11/2014 $94,818 $83,449
30/09/2013 17/11/2014 $70,000 $100,500
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2021 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Julia Louise Mackie Trustee 21/02/2022
Reece O'Leary Trustee 25/05/2021
Marilyn Judith Wright Trustee 4/04/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Phil Kay Trustee 14/11/2022
Matthew Lawson Trustee 9/09/2021
Brian Pritchard Trustee 15/06/2018
Alastair Bramley Trustee 31/03/2016
Arthur Thorpe Gemmell Trustee 31/03/2016
Barbara Arnott Trustee 31/03/2016
Diane Taylor Trustee 31/03/2016
Drew Broadley Trustee 31/03/2016
Rex McIntyre Trustee 31/03/2016
Timothy Gilbertson Trustee 14/09/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/03/2022 NOC021
26/03/2022 NOC020
27/09/2021 NOC019
8/06/2021 NOC017
11/04/2021 NOC016
23/05/2019 NOC013
20/01/2012 NOC006
20/01/2012 NOC005
5/11/2010 NOC004
23/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents