pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gisborne Volunteer Centre
CC27533
9429043125487
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Block 1, Shop 2, Treble Court Complex
25 Peel St
Gisborne
4010

Charity's other details

(06)8684522
Facebook icon image
Gisborne Volunteer Centre


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support and assistance to volunteers, community welfare agencies and other volunteer-involving not-for profits organisations means of: a) Providing quality programmes of volunteer referral and recruitment to non-profit organisations. b) Assisting and educating non-profit organisations which use volunteers in how to train and manage them, to the benefit of both the organisation and the volunteer. c) Actively promoting the benefits of volunteer work. d) Advocating the rights and responsibilities of volunteers, and the recognition of their work. e) To increase the awareness of the availability and value of volunteers and volunteerism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, provides workshops

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Trust Structure: Our Trust Deed states that we must have between five and ten Trustees. As at the 2020 AGM, we have six Trustees, including the Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary. Operational Structure: We employ a manager, Volunteer Service Coordinator, Media and Communications Coordinator and an office administration support worker. We also have casual volunteers who help with various activities throughout the year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 17/11/2022 $125,232 $124,663
31/12/2021 14/10/2021 $160,848 $136,432
31/12/2020 5/10/2020 $122,288 $121,070
31/12/2019 20/10/2019 $135,721 $141,791
31/12/2018 26/09/2018 $119,205 $107,191
31/12/2017 20/09/2017 $91,558 $94,066
31/12/2016 12/10/2016 $89,458 $84,543
31/12/2015 29/09/2015 $82,780 $91,855
31/12/2014 24/09/2014 $96,501 $77,470

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Laurence Guite Youth Board Member 21/11/2022
Neil Smoker Board Chairperson 21/11/2022
Ruby Rose Aitkenhead Youth Board Member 21/11/2022
Hilary Pickering Treasurer 27/09/2021
Katie Brown Board member 27/09/2021
Amber Aitkenhead Board Member 5/10/2020
Nicki Liversage Board Member - Secretary 17/10/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hemi (James) Phillip Houkamau Chairperson 23/01/2023
Michael West Secretary 30/06/2022
Brian Charles Cochrane Treasurer 13/10/2021
Michelle Belinda Whitley Deputy Chairperson 27/09/2021
Briar Hunter Board member 30/06/2020
Lillian Jenner Board Member - Youth Rep 17/10/2019
Brittany Marshall Board Member 9/09/2019
James Jnr Aramoana Trustee 9/09/2019
Murray Carl Pedersen Chairperson 15/07/2019
Arish Naresh Board Member 15/04/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/10/2023 NOC037
21/11/2022 NOC036
20/07/2022 NOC034
26/02/2020 NOC031
22/10/2019 NOC030
8/07/2019 NOC028
27/06/2019 NOC027
15/11/2018 NOC026
15/11/2018 NOC025
20/09/2017 NOC023

Charity Documents